EP3800485 - FMCW RADAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imec VZW Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2021/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAESEN, Kristof IMEC VZW c/o IMEC VZW, patent department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 02 /
GUERMANDI, Davide IMEC VZW c/o IMEC VZW, patent department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 03 /
VISWESWARAN, Akshay IMEC VZW c/o IMEC VZW, patent department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 04 /
BREBELS, Steven IMEC VZW c/o IMEC VZW, patent department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 05 /
WAMBACQ, Pierre IMEC VZW c/o IMEC VZW, patent department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2021/14] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/14] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 19200784.7 | 01.10.2019 | [2021/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3800485 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/32, G01S7/35 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
G01S13/32 (EP);
G01S7/35 (EP);
G01S7/352 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FMCW-RADAR | [2021/14] | English: | FMCW RADAR | [2021/14] | French: | RADAR FMCW | [2021/14] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/11] | 28.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017123058 (YAVARI EHSAN [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * paragraph [0111] *; | [A]US7944392 (FALK KENT [SE]) [A] 1,7 * page 1 *; | [A]WO2018109745 (IDS GEORADAR S R L [IT]) [A] 5,6 * pages 12, 29; figures 3, 6 * | [IA] - JEONG-GEUN K ET AL, "24 GHz circularly polarized Doppler radar with a single antenna", 2005 EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE CNIT LA DEFENSE, PARIS, FRANCE OCT. 4-6, 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20061004), ISBN 978-2-9600551-2-2, pages 1 - 4, XP002402601 [I] 1-4,7 * abstract; page 2; figure 1 * [A] 5,6 | [A] - S.R.J. AXELSSON, "Radar profiling above pine forests", GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING SYMPOSIUM, 1995. IGARSS '95. 'QUANTITATIVE REMOTE SENSING FOR SCIENCE AND APPLICATIONS', INTERNATIONAL, (19950101), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/IGARSS.1995.520260, ISBN 978-0-7803-2567-8, pages 284 - 288, XP055643628 [A] 1,7 * page 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IGARSS.1995.520260 |