EP3620282 - OSB WOOD-BASED PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/11] | METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF OSB WOOD-BASE PANELS WITH REDUCED EMISSION OF VOLATILE ORGANIC COMPOUNDS (VOCS) | ||
[2021/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWISS KRONO Tec AG Museggstrasse 14 6004 Luzern / CH | [2020/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALWA, Norbert Birkenweg 18a 32805 Horn-Bad Meinberg / DE | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2020/11] | Application number, filing date | 19201042.9 | 25.04.2017 | [2020/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3620282 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3620282 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B27N1/00, B27K1/02, // B27K1/00, B27N3/14 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
B27N1/003 (EP);
B27N1/00 (CN,RU,US);
B27K1/02 (EP,US);
B27K5/001 (EP);
B27K5/007 (EP);
B27K5/0085 (CN);
B27K5/04 (CN);
B27L1/00 (US);
B27L11/007 (US);
B27N3/04 (RU);
B27N3/08 (CN);
B27N3/143 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] |
Former [2020/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OSB-HOLZWERKSTOFFPLATTE | [2021/26] | English: | OSB WOOD-BASED PANEL | [2021/26] | French: | PANNEAU OSB EN MATÉRIAUX DÉRIVÉS DU BOIS | [2021/26] |
Former [2020/11] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OSB-HOLZWERKSTOFFPLATTEN MIT REDUZIERTER EMISSION AN FLÜCHTIGEN ORGANISCHEN VERBINDUNGEN (VOCS) | ||
Former [2020/11] | METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF OSB WOOD-BASE PANELS WITH REDUCED EMISSION OF VOLATILE ORGANIC COMPOUNDS (VOCS) | ||
Former [2020/11] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PANNEAUX EN MATÉRIAUX DÉRIVÉS DU BOIS OSB À FAIBLE ÉMISSION DE COMPOSÉS ORGANIQUES VOLATILS (COV) | Examination procedure | 08.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 08.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17167974.9 / EP3395520 | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 03.11.2021 | CY | 03.11.2021 | DK | 03.11.2021 | EE | 03.11.2021 | FI | 03.11.2021 | HR | 03.11.2021 | LT | 03.11.2021 | LV | 03.11.2021 | MC | 03.11.2021 | MK | 03.11.2021 | RS | 03.11.2021 | SE | 03.11.2021 | SI | 03.11.2021 | SK | 03.11.2021 | SM | 03.11.2021 | BG | 03.02.2022 | NO | 03.02.2022 | GR | 04.02.2022 | IS | 03.03.2022 | IE | 25.04.2022 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
CY | 03.11.2021 | ||
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
MC | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SI | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 03.11.2021 | |
DK | 03.11.2021 | ||
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | DK | 03.11.2021 | |
EE | 03.11.2021 | ||
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SK | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 03.11.2021 | |
FI | 03.11.2021 | ||
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 03.11.2021 | |
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
SM | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 03.11.2021 | |
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
NO | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 03.11.2021 | |
HR | 03.11.2021 | ||
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
LV | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
SE | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
GR | 04.02.2022 | ||
IS | 03.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 03.11.2021 | |
LT | 03.11.2021 | ||
RS | 03.11.2021 | ||
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 03.11.2021 | |
BG | 03.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 03.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0695609 (SIEMPELKAMP GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-6,11-15 * figures 2,3; claims 1,2,8,10; table 1 * * page 2, lines 8-9,12-13,32-37 * * page 3, lines 23-25,32-34,41-43,49-52 * * page 4, lines 16-17,23-24 * * page 4, line 49 - page 5, line 7 * * page 3, lines 13-15,46-48 *; | [XI]DE102012101716 (GEORG AUGUST UNI GOETTINGEN STIFTUNG OEFFENTLICHEN RECHTS [DE]) [X] 1-8,10-15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0012] , [0015] , [0021] , [0025] , [0028] , [0031] , [0032] , [0034] , [0036] , [0037] , [0040]; figure 6; example 9; claims 1-4,8,10 * [I] 9; | [XI]EP2727691 (KRONOTEC AG [CH]) [X] 1-8,11-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] , [0017] , [0033] , [0036]; claims 1,6-9,13,15 * [I] 9; | [T] - Anonymous, "Steam", (20170404), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Steam&oldid=773727907, (20171214), XP055435287 [T] 1 * page 1, paragraph erster Absatz * | Examination | DE102010050788 | DE102013001678 | by applicant | EP1907178 |