Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11186140 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2021 | B2 | US2020108695 | 09.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT201800009234 | 08.10.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3636469 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2021 | B1 | EP3636469 | 15.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT201800009234 | 08.10.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2884129T | 10.12.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | IT201800009234 | 08.10.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT201800009234 | 08.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT201800009234 | 08.10.2018 |