EP3800865 - CROWDSOURCING PERFORMANCE INDICATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HERE Global B.V. Kennedyplein 222-226 5611 ZT Eindhoven / NL | [2021/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUOMI, Marko Lomarantatie 15 33880 Lempäälä / FI | 02 /
NURMINEN, Henri Jaakko Julius c/o HERE Platform Kalevantie 2 33100 Tampere / FI | 03 /
IVANOV, Pavel c/o HERE Platform Kalevantie 2 33100 Tampere / FI | [2021/14] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/14] | Application number, filing date | 19201438.9 | 04.10.2019 | [2021/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3800865 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04W4/02, H04L12/26, G01S5/02 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
H04L67/125 (EP);
H04W72/542 (US);
G01S5/02524 (EP);
G01S5/02526 (EP);
H04L43/0876 (EP);
H04L67/34 (EP);
H04L67/52 (EP);
H04L67/75 (EP);
H04W4/025 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] |
Former [2021/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CROWDSOURCING-LEISTUNGSINDIKATOREN | [2021/14] | English: | CROWDSOURCING PERFORMANCE INDICATORS | [2021/14] | French: | INDICATEURS DE PERFORMANCE D'EXTERNALISATION OUVERTE | [2021/14] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 07.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2018206136 (CHOW BRENNEN STEPHEN [CA], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * claim 1 * * paragraph [0065] *; | [X]US2018262991 (RAO KARTHIK [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0089] *; | [A]WO2019141347 (HERE GLOBAL BV [NL]) [A] 1-16* abstract * |