EP3650567 - HIGH-STRENGTH AND HIGH-TOUGHNESS MAGNESIUM ALLOY AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CITIC Dicastal Co., Ltd. 185 Longhai Ave. Economic and Technological Development Zone Qinhuangdao, Hebei 066011 / CN | [2022/40] |
Former [2021/40] | For all designated states Citic Dicastal Co., Ltd. 185 Longhai Ave. Economic and Technological Development Zone Qinhuangdao Hebei 066011 / CN | ||
Former [2020/20] | For all designated states Citic Dicastal Co., Ltd. 185 Longhai Ave. Economic and Technological Development Zone 066011 Quinhuangdao, Heibei / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DING, Kedi c/o CITIC Dicastal Co., Ltd. 185 Longhai Ave., Economic & Technological Development Zone Qinhuangdao, Hebei 066011 / CN | 02 /
QIAO, Haibo c/o CITIC Dicastal Co., Ltd. 185 Longhai Ave., Economic & Technological Development Zone Qinhuangdao, Hebei 066011 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Lixin c/o CITIC Dicastal Co., Ltd. 185 Longhai Ave., Economic & Technological Development Zone Qinhuangdao, Hebei 066011 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Lisheng c/o CITIC Dicastal Co., Ltd. 185 Longhai Ave., Economic & Technological Development Zone Qinhuangdao, Hebei 066011 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Zhendong c/o CITIC Dicastal Co., Ltd. 185 Longhai Ave., Economic & Technological Development Zone Qinhuangdao, Hebei 066011 / CN | [2020/20] | Representative(s) | Gerauer, Marc Philippé, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2022/11] |
Former [2020/20] | Gerauer, Marc Philippé, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 DE-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19201494.2 | 04.10.2019 | [2020/20] | Priority number, date | CN201811321991 | 08.11.2018 Original published format: CN201811321991 | [2020/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3650567 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3650567 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C22C23/02, C22F1/06 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
C22F1/06 (EP,CN,US);
C22C23/02 (EP,CN,US);
C22C1/02 (US);
C22C1/03 (CN);
C22F1/002 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] | Validation states | MA | 04.10.2019 | Title | German: | HOCHFESTE UND HOCHZÄHE MAGNESIUMLEGIERUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/20] | English: | HIGH-STRENGTH AND HIGH-TOUGHNESS MAGNESIUM ALLOY AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF | [2020/20] | French: | ALLIAGE DE MAGNÉSIUM À RÉSISTANCE ET ROBUSTESSE ÉLEVÉES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2020/20] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 28.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.02.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.10.2019 | AL | 16.03.2022 | AT | 16.03.2022 | CY | 16.03.2022 | CZ | 16.03.2022 | DK | 16.03.2022 | EE | 16.03.2022 | ES | 16.03.2022 | FI | 16.03.2022 | HR | 16.03.2022 | IT | 16.03.2022 | LT | 16.03.2022 | LV | 16.03.2022 | MC | 16.03.2022 | MK | 16.03.2022 | NL | 16.03.2022 | PL | 16.03.2022 | RO | 16.03.2022 | RS | 16.03.2022 | SE | 16.03.2022 | SI | 16.03.2022 | SK | 16.03.2022 | SM | 16.03.2022 | BG | 16.06.2022 | NO | 16.06.2022 | GR | 17.06.2022 | IS | 16.07.2022 | PT | 18.07.2022 | IE | 04.10.2022 | LU | 04.10.2022 | BE | 31.10.2022 | CH | 31.10.2022 | LI | 31.10.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | HU | 04.10.2019 | |
AL | 16.03.2022 | ||
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CY | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
IE | 04.10.2022 | ||
LU | 04.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 04.10.2019 | |
AL | 16.03.2022 | ||
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
IE | 04.10.2022 | ||
LU | 04.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
IE | 04.10.2022 | ||
LU | 04.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
LU | 04.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
LU | 04.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
LU | 04.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | FI | 16.03.2022 | |
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 16.03.2022 | |
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 16.03.2022 | |
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 16.03.2022 | |
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 16.03.2022 | |
NO | 16.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002104593 (PEKGULERYUZ MIHRIBAN OZDEN [CA], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 3, paragraphs 40, 48-; example AZ91D * * claims 3,6,9 *; | [A]EP1685267 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0039]; claim 1; table 4 *; | [A]US2009196787 (BEALS RANDY S [US]) [A] 1,2 * example Series 5; table 1 * * claim 1 *; | [AD]CN104032196 (HEBEI MEILUN MAGNESIUM ALLOY TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [AD] 1,2 * paragraphs [0020] , [0 48] , [0 56] *; | [A]EP2613817 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0020]; claim 1; table I *; | [A] - CAIN T ET AL, "A Compilation of Corrosion Potentials for Magnesium Alloys", CORROSION, NACE, vol. 70, no. 10, doi:10.5006/1257, ISSN 0010-9312, (20141001), pages 1043 - 1051, (20140522), XP001592187 [A] 1 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5006/1257 | by applicant | CN103290292 | CN104032196 | CN104328320 |