EP3632388 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN ACCESS RAMP TO A VEHICLE DOOR AND ASSOCIATED VEHICLE, CONTROLLING METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/15] | ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A RAMP FOR ACCESSING A DOOR OF A VEHICLE, ASSOCIATED VEHICLE, CONTROL METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | ||
[2024/25] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRANSDEV GROUP INNOVATION Immeuble Crystal 3 allée de Grenelle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2020/36] |
Former [2020/15] | For all designated states Transdev Group 3 allée de Grenelle 92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DARNAUD, Thomas 60 rue des Chantiers 78000 Versailles / FR | 02 /
DESMOINEAUX, Nicolas 6 rue Sainte Geneviève 92400 Courbevoie / FR | 03 /
KARAOGUZ, Cem 19 rue Carnot, Bât. A Esc. 2 91120 Palaiseau / FR | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2020/15] | Application number, filing date | 19201551.9 | 04.10.2019 | [2020/15] | Priority number, date | FR20180059246 | 05.10.2018 Original published format: FR 1859246 | [2020/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3632388 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61G3/06, B63B27/14, B60P1/43, B65G69/28 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
A61G3/061 (EP,US);
B60P1/435 (EP);
G05D1/0088 (US);
A61G2203/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] |
Former [2020/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINER ZUGANGSRAMPE ZU EINER FAHRZEUGTÜR UND ZUGEHÖRIGEM FAHRZEUG, STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2024/25] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN ACCESS RAMP TO A VEHICLE DOOR AND ASSOCIATED VEHICLE, CONTROLLING METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2024/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE DE PILOTAGE D'UNE RAMPE D'ACCÈS À UNE PORTE DE VÉHICULE, VÉHICULE, PROCÉDÉ DE PILOTAGE ET PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR ASSOCIÉS | [2020/15] |
Former [2020/15] | ELEKTRONISCHE STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG EINER ZUGANGSRAMPE ZU EINER FAHRZEUGTÜR, ENTSPRECHENDES FAHRZEUG, ENTSPRECHENDE STEUERUNG UND ENTSPRECHENDES COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT | ||
Former [2020/15] | ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A RAMP FOR ACCESSING A DOOR OF A VEHICLE, ASSOCIATED VEHICLE, CONTROL METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | Examination procedure | 08.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 08.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.05.2024 | 30.05.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009106918 (VAN ROOSMALEN LINDA [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,9-11 * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] - [0047]; figures 1-13 * [I] 2,6,8; | [XI]US2009274542 (POCOBELLO MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,9-11 * paragraph [0048]; figures 1-8 * [I] 2,6,8; | [XI]US2015047133 (SVEUM MATTHEW [US]) [X] 1,3-5,10,11 * paragraphs [0030] - [0032]; figures 1-20 *[I] 8; | [XAI]US2018044124 (VOLLMAR MICHAEL S [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,9-11 * paragraph [0036]; figures 1-13 * [A] 7 [I] 2,8; | [XI]EP3311785 (AIRBUS DEFENCE & SPACE LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3,10,11 * paragraphs [0049] , [0077]; figures 1-13 * [I] 2,8 |