17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
26.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] |
21.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
10.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
16.09.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
06.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
29.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
15.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] |
08.10.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
05.10.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
05.10.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.10.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.07.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.05.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.01.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
15.01.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
15.01.2021 |
Change - designated states |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
15.01.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.07.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.06.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
12.10.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.10.2019 |
Change - representative |
|