EP3613301 - SYSTEM FOR VAPORIZATION OF SUBSTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JT International S.A. 8, rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Monsees, James 2019 19th Street San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 02 /
Bowen, Adam 360 Elm Street San Mateo, CA 94401 / US | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/09] | Karl, Christof Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19201872.9 | 18.07.2006 | [2020/09] | Priority number, date | US200570010505P | 19.07.2005 Original published format: US 70010505 P | US200648516806 | 11.07.2006 Original published format: US 48516806 | [2020/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3613301 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3613301 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/40, A24D1/14, A61M15/06, A61M11/04, A24F13/04, A61M15/00 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
A24F13/04 (EP,US);
A24D1/14 (KR,US);
A24D3/18 (KR);
A24F40/40 (EP,US);
A24F40/42 (EP,US);
A24F40/48 (US);
A24F40/60 (EP,US);
A24F42/10 (EP,US);
A24F42/60 (EP,US);
A24F7/00 (US);
A61M11/042 (EP,US);
A61M11/048 (EP,US);
A61M15/0028 (EP,US);
A61M15/06 (EP,US);
F23Q2/32 (US);
F23Q3/002 (US);
A24F40/20 (EP,US);
A61M2205/0266 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3368 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/09] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERDAMPFUNG EINER SUBSTANZ | [2020/09] | English: | SYSTEM FOR VAPORIZATION OF SUBSTANCE | [2020/09] | French: | APPAREIL DE VAPORISATION D'UNE SUBSTANCE | [2020/09] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 24.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06787864.5 / EP1959766 | EP13189967.6 / EP2754360 | EP17195788.9 / EP3311684 | EP18214907.0 / EP3488717 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.06.2021
10.06.2021
ADMISSIBLE Behrends, Frederik Schützenstraße 26 48143 Münster / DE Opponent's representative Pelster Behrends Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Bosch-Straße 17b 48153 Münster / DE | 02
09.06.2021
Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | 03
09.06.2021
Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH Opponent's representative DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | 04
09.06.2021
Imperial Tobacco Ventures Limited 121 Winterstoke Road Bristol BS3 2LL / GB Opponent's representative Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.06.2021
10.06.2021
ADMISSIBLE Behrends, Frederik Schützenstraße 26 48143 Münster / DE Opponent's representative Pelster Behrends Patentanwälte PartG mbB Haus Sentmaring 17 48151 Münster / DE | ||
02
09.06.2021
Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | |||
03
09.06.2021
Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH Opponent's representative DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | |||
04
09.06.2021
Imperial Tobacco Ventures Limited 121 Winterstoke Road Bristol BS3 2LL / GB Opponent's representative Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | 23.06.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.11.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.12.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 21.03.2023 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/17] | Appeal following opposition | 27.02.2023 | Appeal received No. T0418/23 | 27.02.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 21.03.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.07.2022 | BG | 18.07.2022 | CY | 18.07.2022 | FI | 18.07.2022 | IE | 18.07.2022 | LT | 18.07.2022 | LU | 18.07.2022 | LV | 18.07.2022 | HU | 19.07.2022 | SE | 19.07.2022 | SI | 19.07.2022 | BE | 31.07.2022 | DK | 31.07.2022 | EE | 31.07.2022 | MC | 01.08.2022 | NL | 01.08.2022 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/31] | AT | 18.07.2022 | |
CY | 18.07.2022 | ||
FI | 18.07.2022 | ||
IE | 18.07.2022 | ||
LT | 18.07.2022 | ||
LU | 18.07.2022 | ||
LV | 18.07.2022 | ||
HU | 19.07.2022 | ||
SE | 19.07.2022 | ||
SI | 19.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
DK | 31.07.2022 | ||
EE | 31.07.2022 | ||
MC | 01.08.2022 | ||
NL | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 18.07.2022 | |
CY | 18.07.2022 | ||
FI | 18.07.2022 | ||
LT | 18.07.2022 | ||
LU | 18.07.2022 | ||
LV | 18.07.2022 | ||
HU | 19.07.2022 | ||
SE | 19.07.2022 | ||
SI | 19.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
DK | 31.07.2022 | ||
EE | 31.07.2022 | ||
MC | 01.08.2022 | ||
NL | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 18.07.2022 | |
CY | 18.07.2022 | ||
FI | 18.07.2022 | ||
LT | 18.07.2022 | ||
LU | 18.07.2022 | ||
LV | 18.07.2022 | ||
HU | 19.07.2022 | ||
SE | 19.07.2022 | ||
SI | 19.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
EE | 31.07.2022 | ||
MC | 01.08.2022 | ||
NL | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 18.07.2022 | |
CY | 18.07.2022 | ||
FI | 18.07.2022 | ||
LT | 18.07.2022 | ||
LU | 18.07.2022 | ||
LV | 18.07.2022 | ||
HU | 19.07.2022 | ||
SE | 19.07.2022 | ||
SI | 19.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
EE | 31.07.2022 | ||
MC | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 18.07.2022 | |
CY | 18.07.2022 | ||
FI | 18.07.2022 | ||
LT | 18.07.2022 | ||
LU | 18.07.2022 | ||
LV | 18.07.2022 | ||
HU | 19.07.2022 | ||
SE | 19.07.2022 | ||
SI | 19.07.2022 | ||
EE | 31.07.2022 | ||
MC | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 18.07.2022 | |
FI | 18.07.2022 | ||
LT | 18.07.2022 | ||
LU | 18.07.2022 | ||
LV | 18.07.2022 | ||
HU | 19.07.2022 | ||
SE | 19.07.2022 | ||
EE | 31.07.2022 | ||
MC | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 18.07.2022 | |
FI | 18.07.2022 | ||
LT | 18.07.2022 | ||
LU | 18.07.2022 | ||
SE | 19.07.2022 | ||
MC | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | LT | 18.07.2022 | |
LU | 18.07.2022 | ||
MC | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 18.07.2022 | |
MC | 01.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | MC | 01.08.2022 | |
Former [2022/10] | deleted | ||
Former [2021/14] | PL | 09.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3200819 (GILBERT HERBERT A) [A] 4-6,14,15* column 1, line 30 - line 36; figure -; claim - *; | [XI]EP0241698 (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US]) [X] 1,2,7-11,16-20 * page 3, line 2 - line 11 * * page 7, line 33 - page 8, line 7; figure 3 * [I] 3,12; | [XI]US5666977 (HIGGINS CHARLES T [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8,10,13,16,18-20 * column 5, line 21 - line 29; figure -; claim - * [I] 2-6,9,11,12,14,15,17; | [XI]GB2401548 (BOOTS HEALTHCARE INT LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3,4,7,8,10,13,16,18-20 * page 9, line 17 - line 28; figure - * * page 10, line 6 - line 18 * [I] 2,5,6,9,11,12,14,15,17; | [I]WO2005025654 (INJET DIGITAL AEROSOLS LTD [AU], et al) [I] 1-20 * page 20, line 29 - page 21, line 11; figure - * | by applicant | US3792704 | US4020853 | US4219032 | US4848374 | US6164287 | US2004031495 | US2004237974 | Opposition | US2104266 | EP0129985 | US4708151 | US5249586 | US5479948 | WO9639879 | WO03068300 | WO03082031 | US2006102175 | WO2007012007 | US3200819 | EP0241698 | WO9406314 | US5388594 | US5666977 | GB2401548 | WO2005025654 | JP2006064089 | EP0358002 | US6450419 | US2004021017 | US2005285538 | EP3488717 | US4066088 | US5894841 | WO0028842 | US2003154991 | WO03094640 | US2004149296 | US2005067503 |