Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021091457 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916565033 | 09.09.2019 | US201715678704 | 16.08.2017 | US201816134898 | 18.09.2018 | US201514659689 | 17.03.2015 | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US202017113946 | 07.12.2020 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9755296 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2017 | B2 | US2015188215 | 02.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514659689 | 17.03.2015 | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10873125 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2020 | B2 | US2019393588 | 26.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916565033 | 09.09.2019 | US201715678704 | 16.08.2017 | US201816134898 | 18.09.2018 | US201514659689 | 17.03.2015 | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10439271 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2019 | B2 | US2019020102 | 17.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715678704 | 16.08.2017 | US201816134898 | 18.09.2018 | US201514659689 | 17.03.2015 | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10290926 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2019 | B2 | US2017346166 | 30.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715678704 | 16.08.2017 | US201514659689 | 17.03.2015 | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101696162B | Global Dossier | 13.01.2017 | B1 | KR20160042163 | 18.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US52137 | 23.08.2012 | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101610611B | Global Dossier | 07.04.2016 | B1 | KR20150123956 | 04.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US52137 | 23.08.2012 | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101562751B | Global Dossier | 22.10.2015 | B1 | KR20140042919 | 07.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US52137 | 23.08.2012 | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5879439B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2016 | B2 | JP2014527241 | 09.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US52137 | 23.08.2012 | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4407795 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US52137 | 23.08.2012 | EP22166361 | 23.08.2012 | EP12769512 | 23.08.2012 | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | EP19201964 | 23.08.2012 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4043996 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2024 | B1 | EP4043996 | 17.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US52137 | 23.08.2012 | EP12769512 | 23.08.2012 | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | EP19201964 | 23.08.2012 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3416023 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2019 | B1 | EP3416023 | 19.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US52137 | 23.08.2012 | EP12769512 | 23.08.2012 | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3401755 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2019 | B1 | EP3401755 | 14.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US52137 | 23.08.2012 | EP12769512 | 23.08.2012 | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2737382 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2019 | B1 | EP2737382 | 04.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US52137 | 23.08.2012 | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106200785B | Global Dossier | 05.11.2019 | B | CN106200785 | 07.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201210410011 | 31.08.2012 | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012300421B | Global Dossier | 13.08.2015 | B9 | AU2012300421B | 16.07.2015 | B2 | AU2012300421 | 27.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US52137 | 23.08.2012 | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3650981 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2022 | B1 | EP3650981 | 13.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US52137 | 23.08.2012 | EP12769512 | 23.08.2012 | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013032870 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9007748 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2015 | B2 | US2013050911 | 28.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6188838B | Global Dossier | 30.08.2017 | B2 | JP2016119114 | 30.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102970846B | Global Dossier | 25.05.2016 | B | CN102970846 | 13.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN202855891U | 03.04.2013 | U | Priority number | Date | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2759494T | 11.05.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1180171 | 11.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1257993 | 01.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI484707B | 11.05.2015 | B | TW201324989 | 16.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI611627B | 11.01.2018 | B | TW201530897 | 01.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI662739B | 11.06.2019 | B | TW201806233 | 16.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI712214B | 01.12.2020 | B | TW201931670 | 01.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161529728 | 31.08.2011 | US201113251026 | 30.09.2011 | Type | Divisional application | EP4043996 | Type | Earlier application | EP2737382 |