EP3620470 - TEM8 ANTIBODIES AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 18.12.2024 [2024/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The United States of America, as represented by The Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services Office of Technology Transfer National Institutes of Health 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 MSC 7660 Bethesda, MD 20892-7660 / US | For all designated states Biomed Valley Discoveries, Inc. 4520 Main Street 16th Floor Kansas City, Missouri 64111 / US | [2020/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIMITROV, Dimiter 1019 Storrington Dirve Frederick, MD 21702 / US | 02 /
ZHU, Zhongyu 2501 Carrington Way Frederick, MD 21702 / US | 03 /
ST. CROIX, Brad 9010 Allington Manor Circle West Frederick, MD 21703 / US | 04 /
ZUDAIRE, Enrique The Janssen Pharmaceutical Companies of Johnson & Johnson 1400 McKean Road Sorint House, PA 19477 / US | 05 /
SAHA, Saurabh 44 Carlsbrooke Road Wellesley Hills, MA 02481 / US | 06 /
ZHANG, Xiaoyan Michelle 3 Kitson Park Drive Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 07 /
DECRESCENZO, Gary 4520 Main Street 16th Floor Kansas City, MO 64111 / US | 08 /
WELSCH, Dean 4520 Main Street 16th Floor Kansas City, MO 64111 / US | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2023/30] |
Former [2020/11] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19201975.0 | 13.10.2014 | [2020/11] | Priority number, date | US201361889958P | 11.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361889958 P | [2020/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3620470 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3620470 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61P35/00, A61K47/68, A61P31/04, C07H21/04, // A61K39/00 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
C07K16/28 (EP,US);
A61K39/39558 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K47/68031 (EP,US);
A61K47/6849 (EP,US);
A61K47/6851 (EP,US);
A61K47/6855 (US);
A61K47/6865 (US);
A61K49/16 (US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61P31/04 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07H21/04 (EP,US);
C07K14/7051 (US);
C07K16/30 (US);
C07K16/3046 (US);
C12N15/09 (US);
C12N15/63 (US);
G01N33/574 (US);
G01N33/57419 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/54 (US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/54 (US);
C07K2317/55 (US);
C07K2317/56 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/567 (US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] |
Former [2020/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TEM-8-ANTIKÖRPER UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2020/11] | English: | TEM8 ANTIBODIES AND THEIR USE | [2020/11] | French: | ANTICORPS TEM8 ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2020/11] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 13.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14789480.2 / EP3054987 | Divisional application(s) | EP23181092.0 / EP4269421 | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | BG | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | IE | 13.10.2023 | LU | 13.10.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/51] |
Former [2024/46] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SI | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
IE | 13.10.2023 | ||
LU | 13.10.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
BE | 31.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SI | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 13.10.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
BE | 31.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 13.10.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 13.10.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2012174160 (US HEALTH [US], et al); | [A]WO2012172495 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | by applicant | US498298 | US3060165 | US3896111 | US4036945 | US4137230 | US4151042 | US4235871 | US4248870 | US4256746 | US4260608 | US4265814 | US4294757 | US4307016 | US4308268 | US4308269 | US4309428 | US4313946 | US4315929 | US4317821 | US4322348 | US4331647 | US4331598 | US4361650 | US4362663 | US4364866 | US4371533 | US4424219 | US4450254 | US4458066 | US4486414 | US4501728 | US4689401 | US4722848 | US4816444 | US4837028 | US4879278 | US4880935 | US4892827 | US4902505 | US4946778 | US4957735 | US4978744 | US4986988 | US5004697 | EP0425235 | US5019369 | US5055303 | US5076973 | US5079163 | US5122368 | US5138036 | US5188837 | US5208020 | US5208021 | US5254342 | US5268164 | US5271961 | US5410024 | US5413797 | US5416064 | US5504191 | US5506206 | US5512658 | US5514670 | US5521284 | US5530097 | US5530020 | US5534496 | US5554725 | US5585089 | US5589466 | US5593972 | US5599902 | US5602095 | US5608039 | US5622929 | US5635483 | US5643578 | WO9730087 | US5663149 | US5665860 | US5780588 | US5792458 | US5817637 | US5821238 | US5824805 | US5854044 | WO9858964 | US5880103 | WO9922764 | US5912264 | WO9951643 | WO9954440 | US6034065 | WO0061739 | US6214345 | WO0129246 | US6239104 | US6323315 | WO0231140 | US6441163 | US2002164328 | WO02088172 | WO03002609 | WO03011878 | US2003083263 | US2003115614 | US6602684 | US2003157108 | US6610860 | WO03085119 | WO03084570 | WO03085107 | WO2004010957 | WO2004018478 | US6723538 | US2004093621 | US2004110704 | US2004110282 | US2004109865 | US2004132140 | WO2004056312 | WO2005035572 | WO2005035586 | WO2005035778 | US6884869 | US2005123546 | WO2005053742 | US2005238649 | WO2006003448 | US2006024317 | US2006074008 | US7112324 | WO2007016150 | US7229760 | US7235641 | US2007258987 | US7323440 | US7332168 | WO2008077546 | US7435549 | US2008305044 | US7498298 | WO2009032954 | US7575923 | US7635472 | US2010093979 | US7820166 | WO2011032022 | US2011070248 | US7919089 | US7964567 | US8007796 | US2011212088 | US8017748 | US2011268751 | US8076459 | WO2012079000 | US2012213783 | WO2012174160 | WO2013059593 | WO2013126726 | WO2013163427 |