|
20.09.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.07.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.07.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
127 |
|
20.07.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
130 |
|
27.06.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.06.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.06.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2023 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.06.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.06.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
127 |
|
05.06.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
130 |
|
08.05.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.05.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.05.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2023 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.03.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.03.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
127 |
|
31.03.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
130 |
|
27.01.2023 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2022 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2022 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2022 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.05.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.05.2022 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
124 |
|
23.05.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
124 |
|
23.05.2022 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2021 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.06.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.06.2021 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
124 |
|
30.06.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
124 |
|
30.06.2021 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2021 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2021 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2021 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2021 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2021 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2021 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2020 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2020 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.03.2020 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.03.2020 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2020 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2019 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2019 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.10.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
124 |
|
09.10.2019 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2019 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |