19.09.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] |
02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
13.10.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
09.10.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
29.09.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.09.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.09.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.07.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.07.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] |
07.07.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] |
28.06.2023 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
04.06.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.05.2023 |
Change - inventor |
|
19.05.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
19.05.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
08.05.2023 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
30.03.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.03.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] |
03.03.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] |
03.02.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
03.02.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
16.09.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.06.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
24.05.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.09.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.07.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
02.07.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.07.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
02.07.2021 |
Change - designated states |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
18.06.2021 |
Change - applicant |
published on 21.07.2021 [2021/29] |
26.03.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
12.03.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
11.10.2019 |
Change - representative |
|