Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023009312 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19202257 | 09.10.2019 | WO2020EP78253 | 08.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220079601 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19202257 | 09.10.2019 | WO2020EP78253 | 08.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022551165 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19202257 | 09.10.2019 | WO2020EP78253 | 08.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL291412 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19202257 | 09.10.2019 | WO2020EP78253 | 08.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114466855 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19202257 | 09.10.2019 | WO2020EP78253 | 08.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3149938 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19202257 | 09.10.2019 | WO2020EP78253 | 08.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2020363865 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19202257 | 09.10.2019 | WO2020EP78253 | 08.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112022003915 | 23.08.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP19202257 | 09.10.2019 | WO2020EP78253 | 08.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2022003997 | 26.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19202257 | 09.10.2019 | WO2020EP78253 | 08.10.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021069570 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19202257 | 09.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3805243 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2023 | B1 | EP3805243 | 14.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19202257 | 09.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3805243T | 02.01.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP19202257 | 09.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2970792T | 30.05.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP19202257 | 09.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI3805243T | 07.02.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP19202257 | 09.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3805243T | 18.03.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP19202257 | 09.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202128182 | 01.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19202257 | 09.10.2019 |