EP3611957 - TECHNIQUES FOR PROVIDING VISUALIZATION AND ANALYSIS OF PERFORMANCE DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viavi Solutions Inc. 1445 South Spectrum Blvd, Suite 102 Chandler, AZ 85286 / US | [2022/39] |
Former [2020/08] | For all designated states Viavi Solutions Inc. 6001 America Center Drive San Jose, CA 95002 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMANY, Sameh 1523 Stones Peak Drive Longmont, CO 80503 / US | 02 /
RIZZI, Edoardo 3907 Niblick Court Longmont, CO 80503 / US | [2020/08] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/08] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 19202602.9 | 31.10.2014 | [2020/08] | Priority number, date | US201361898819P | 01.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361898819 P | US201361898834P | 01.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361898834 P | [2020/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3611957 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3611957 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L41/149, H04L43/091, H04W24/08 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
H04L41/22 (EP,US);
G06F3/0484 (US);
H04L43/045 (EP,US);
H04W24/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/08] | H04W24/08, H04L12/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] |
Former [2020/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TECHNIKEN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON VISUALISIERUNG UND ANALYSE VON LEISTUNGSDATEN | [2020/08] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR PROVIDING VISUALIZATION AND ANALYSIS OF PERFORMANCE DATA | [2020/08] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE FOURNITURE DE VISUALISATION ET D'ANALYSE DE DONNÉES DE PERFORMANCE | [2020/08] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 19.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 14.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14191366.5 / EP2869625 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2024 | BG | 24.01.2024 | ES | 24.01.2024 | FI | 24.01.2024 | HR | 24.01.2024 | LT | 24.01.2024 | LV | 24.01.2024 | NL | 24.01.2024 | PL | 24.01.2024 | SE | 24.01.2024 | NO | 24.04.2024 | RS | 24.04.2024 | GR | 25.04.2024 | IS | 24.05.2024 | PT | 24.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
LV | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
PL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
PT | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 24.01.2024 | |
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 24.01.2024 | |
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 24.01.2024 | |
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 24.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004093521 (HAMADEH IHAB [US], et al) [A] 7,14* abstract *; | [Y]WO2005109754 (SYNEMATICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-13,15 * page 16, lines 4-8; figure 2 * * page 8 - page 9; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2005270982 (MCBEATH TOM [US]) [Y] 7,14 * paragraph [0047]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2011085443 (SHIKANO HIROAKI [JP]) [A] 1,8 * paragraph [0061] *; | [Y]US2013002675 (HICKS PATRICK [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0047]; figures 4,7 *; | [A]US2013157688 (KATELEY RICHARD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0102]; figure 8a * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0079]; figures 5a-b * | by applicant | EP2869625 | EP20140191366 |