EP3805003 - LASER MARKABLE ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2022 [2022/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGFA NV Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEHERICEY, Marie c/o AGFA NV, IP-Department 3622 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
LIGOT, Amandine c/o AGFA NV, IP-Department 3622 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 03 /
REEB, Charles c/o AGFA NV, IP-Department 3622 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 04 /
GOETHALS, Fabienne c/o AGFA NV, IP Department 3622 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 05 /
WYNANTS, Sonny c/o AGFA NV, IP Department 3622 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Viaene, Kris AGFA NV Intellectual Property Department Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19202702.7 | 11.10.2019 | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3805003 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/323, B41M5/333, C09D11/00, // B41M5/337 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
B41M5/323 (EP);
C09D11/037 (EP);
C09D11/101 (EP);
C09D11/322 (EP);
C09D11/328 (EP);
C09D11/50 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LASERMARKIERBARE ARTIKEL | [2021/15] | English: | LASER MARKABLE ARTICLES | [2021/15] | French: | ARTICLES POUVANT ÊTRE MARQUÉS AU LASER | [2021/15] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/15] | 22.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP3219503 (AGFA-GEVAERT [BE]) [X] 1-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0020] - paragraph [0275]; claims 1-15 * [A] 10; | [XA]JPH07304260 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [X] 1,2,6-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] - paragraph [0083]; claims 1,2 * [A] 3-5 | by applicant | WO2008075101 | WO02074548 | WO2007012578 | WO2013014436 | WO2015165854 | WO2015091688 | WO2005068207 | WO2007141522 | WO2009059900 | WO2015015200 | EP3297838 | EP2722367 | WO2019007833 | EP1911814 | GB811066 | EP2719540 | EP2719541 | WO2015091782 | WO2014057018 | WO2012044400 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 223717-84-8 | - CRIVELLO, J.V. et al., Photoinitiators for Free Radical Cationic & Anionic Photopolymerization, John Wiley and Sons Ltd, (19980000), vol. III, pages 287 - 294 |