EP3620547 - LASER ASSISTED OXIDE REMOVAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [2020/11] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEEHAN, Robert J. 11 Colubia Drive Manchester, CT 06042 / US | 02 /
RIDGEWAY, Neil B. 45 Krawski Dr. South Windsor, CT 06074 / US | 03 /
MILLEA, Christopher J. 32 Gardner Tavern Ln. Coventry, CT 06238 / US | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/11] | Application number, filing date | 19203218.3 | 09.02.2016 | [2020/11] | Priority number, date | US201514683820 | 10.04.2015 Original published format: US201514683820 | [2020/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3620547 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/02, C23C4/18, C23C14/08, C23C14/30, C23C28/00, C23C4/073 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
C23C4/02 (EP,US);
B23K26/082 (US);
B23K26/122 (US);
B23K26/1224 (EP,US);
B23K26/123 (US);
B23K26/40 (US);
C23C14/022 (EP,US);
C23C14/083 (EP,US);
C23C14/30 (EP,US);
C23C14/325 (US);
C23C28/3215 (EP,US);
C23C28/3455 (EP,US);
C23C4/073 (EP,US);
C23C4/134 (US);
C23C4/18 (EP,US);
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
B23K2103/10 (EP,US);
F05D2230/13 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] |
Former [2020/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LASERUNTERSTÜTZTE OXIDENTFERNUNG | [2020/11] | English: | LASER ASSISTED OXIDE REMOVAL | [2020/11] | French: | ÉLIMINATION D'OXYDE ASSISTÉE PAR LASER | [2020/11] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 04.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16154795.5 / EP3078760 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - C. CODDET ET AL, "Surface Preparation and Thermal Spray in a Single Step: The PROTAL Process-Example of Application for an Aluminum-Base Substrate", JOURNAL OF THERMAL SPRAY TECHNOLOGY., US, (19990601), vol. 8, no. 2, doi:10.1361/105996399770350467, ISSN 1059-9630, pages 235 - 242, XP055262746 [I] 1-8 * page 235 - page 240 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1361/105996399770350467 | [I] - DIMITRIS K CHRISTOULIS ET AL, "Laser-Assisted Cold Spray (LACS)", C2P-COMPETENCE CENTER FOR SPRAY PROCESSING 2NATIONAL RESEARCH COUNCIL CANADA - INDUSTRIAL MATERIALS INSTITUTE, MONTREAL, QC 3CLFA-FRAUNHOFER-ILT, PARIS,, (20120309), pages 59 - 96, XP009178536 [I] 1-8 * page 63, paragraph 3.2 - page 66 * * page 69, paragraph 5 - page 71 * |