EP3628241 - SURGICAL STAPLER WITH INCOMPLETE FIRING INDICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon LLC 475 Street C, Suite 401 Los Frailes Industrial Park Guaynabo 00969 / PR | [2020/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHEIB, Charles J. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 02 /
MEASAMER, John P. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 03 /
SCHELLIN, Emily A. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 04 /
DINARDO, Brian F. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 05 /
MILLER, Christopher C. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 06 /
BEAR, Brian W. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 07 /
SHELTON, IV, Frederick E. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | [2020/14] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/14] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19203407.2 | 24.06.2016 | [2020/14] | Priority number, date | US201514751406 | 26.06.2015 Original published format: US201514751406 | [2020/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3628241 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/115 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
A61B17/1155 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/068 (CN,US);
A61B2017/00017 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00022 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00119 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00734 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2090/064 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0807 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/46] |
Former [2020/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHES KLAMMERGERÄT MIT ANZEIGER VON UNVOLLSTÄNDIGEM ABSCHUSS | [2020/14] | English: | SURGICAL STAPLER WITH INCOMPLETE FIRING INDICATOR | [2020/14] | French: | AGRAFEUSE CHIRURGICALE AVEC INDICATEUR DE TIR INCOMPLET | [2020/14] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/46] | 01.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16176146.5 / EP3117780 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2165653 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043]; figures 10-16 * [I] 3,6; | [XI]US2011017801 (ZEMLOK MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8 * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0126] - paragraph [0144] * * paragraph [0167] - paragraph [0177]; figures 4, 6 * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0078]; table 1 * [I] 3; | [XA]US2013175320 (MANDAKOLATHUR VASUDEVAN VENKATARAMANAN [US], et al) [X] 1,4,7,8 * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0074]; figure 7 * [A] 2,3,5,6; | [XI]US2014166727 (SWAYZE JEFFREY S [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraphs [0095] , [0 98]; figures 8-14, 18 *[I] 2,3; | [XI]EP2777521 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0234] - paragraph [0248]; figures 183-186 * * paragraph [0278] * [I] 5-8; | [XI]EP2803324 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8 * paragraphs [0048] , [0 50] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0136]; figures 42-49, 61-63 * [I] 3,5,6 | by applicant | US5205459 | US5271544 | US5275322 | US5285945 | US5292053 | US5333773 | US5350104 | US5533661 | US7794475 | US2010264193 | US2012116379 | US2012239012 | US2014144968 | US2014144969 | US2014151429 | US2014151430 | US2014158747 | US2014166717 | US2014166728 | US2014166718 | US8910847 | US2015083772 | US2015083773 | US2015083774 | US2015083775 |