EP3808438 - DEVICE FOR MIXING PROCESS FLUID WITH INITIATOR IN A LDPE REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borealis AG Trabrennstrasse 6-8 1020 Vienna / AT | [2022/10] |
Former [2021/16] | For all designated states Borealis AG IZD Tower Wagramerstraße 17-19 1220 Vienna / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WURNITSCH, Christof Borealis Polyolefine GmbH St.-Peter-Strasse 25 4021 Linz / AT | 02 /
BILINA, Werner Borealis Polyolefine GmbH Danubiastrasse 21-25 2320 Schwechat-Mannswörth / AT | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/51] |
Former [2021/16] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19203596.2 | 16.10.2019 | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3808438 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3808438 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01F25/313, B01F25/433, B01J4/00, B01J19/24, B01J19/26 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
B01J19/26 (EP,CN,US);
B01J4/005 (EP,CN,US);
B01F25/313 (EP);
B01F25/4336 (EP);
B01J19/2415 (EP,CN);
B01J4/002 (EP,CN);
B01F2025/913 (EP);
B01F2025/931 (EP);
B01J2204/002 (EP);
B01J2219/00772 (EP,CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/16] | B01F5/04, B01F5/06, B01J19/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] |
Former [2021/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM MISCHEN EINER PROZESSFLÜSSIGKEIT MIT INITIATOR IN EINEM LDPE-REAKTOR | [2021/16] | English: | DEVICE FOR MIXING PROCESS FLUID WITH INITIATOR IN A LDPE REACTOR | [2021/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MÉLANGE DE FLUIDE DE TRAITEMENT DOTÉ D'UN INITIATEUR DANS UN RÉACTEUR PEBD | [2021/16] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 16.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2023 | CZ | 20.12.2023 | EE | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | FI | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | LV | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SE | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | PT | 22.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 20.12.2023 | |
CZ | 20.12.2023 | ||
EE | 20.12.2023 | ||
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 20.12.2023 | |
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US1454196 (SAMUEL TROOD); | [XA]US4416610 (GALLAGHER JR JOHN P [US]); | [XA]US5863128 (MAZZEI ANGELO L [US]) | by applicant | EP0449092 | WO0248214 | US8308087 |