EP3808976 - A GEARBOX SYSTEM FOR A WIND TURBINE, WIND TURBINE WITH A GEARBOX SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A GEARBOX SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Renovables España, S.L. Calle Roc Boronat 78 08005 Barcelona / ES | [2023/50] |
Former [2021/16] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nies, Jacob Johannes Holsterfeld 16 48499 Salzbergen / DE | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 19203882.6 | 17.10.2019 | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3808976 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3808976 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3808976 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F03D80/70, F16H57/04 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
F03D80/70 (EP,US);
F03D15/00 (US);
F16H57/0447 (EP);
F16H57/045 (EP);
F05B2240/50 (US);
F05B2260/40311 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] |
Former [2021/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GETRIEBESYSTEM FÜR EINE WINDTURBINE, WINDTURBINE MIT EINEM GETRIEBESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES GETRIEBESYSTEMS | [2021/16] | English: | A GEARBOX SYSTEM FOR A WIND TURBINE, WIND TURBINE WITH A GEARBOX SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A GEARBOX SYSTEM | [2021/16] | French: | SYSTÈME DE BOÎTE DE VITESSES POUR ÉOLIENNE, ÉOLIENNE DOTÉE D'UN SYSTÈME DE BOÎTE DE VITESSES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME DE BOÎTE DE VITESSES | [2021/16] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 07.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.12.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2023 | CZ | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | IT | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | PT | 01.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 29.11.2023 | |
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 29.11.2023 | |
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HR | 29.11.2023 | |
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3702008 (BERGISCHE STAHLINDUSTRIE [DE]); | [XI]WO2009147147 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al); | [A]DE102015118203 (NORDEX ENERGY GMBH [DE]) |