EP3809568 - CONVERTER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paatero, Esa-Kai ABB Oy Riihimiehentie 3 01720 Vantaa / FI | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 19204078.0 | 18.10.2019 | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3809568 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/00, H02M5/458, H02J9/06, H02M3/158, H02M3/335, H02M7/217 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
H02J9/062 (EP,US);
G01R19/16538 (US);
G05F1/618 (US);
H02J7/0024 (US);
H02J7/0063 (US);
H02J7/345 (US);
H02J9/068 (EP,US);
H02M3/158 (EP,US);
H02M3/335 (EP);
H02M5/458 (EP);
H02M7/217 (EP);
H02M1/007 (EP);
Y02B10/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] |
Former [2021/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WANDLERANORDNUNG | [2021/16] | English: | CONVERTER ASSEMBLY | [2021/16] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE CONVERTISSEUR | [2021/16] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 13.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.07.2024 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1710890 (EATON POWER QUALITY CORP [US]); | [A]EP2068417 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [IY]US2011187197 (MOTH KLAUS [DK]) | by applicant | US2012025614 |