EP3644407 - SEPARATOR FOR SECONDARY BATTERY AND ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICE USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK Innovation Co., Ltd. 26, Jong-ro Jongno-gu Seoul 03188 / KR | For all designated states SK ie technology Co., Ltd. 26, Jong-ro Jongno-gu Seoul 03188 / KR | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWACK, Won Sub SK Innovation global technology, 325, Expo-ro Yuseong-gu 34124 Daejeon / KR | 02 /
PARK, Min Sang SK Innovation global technology, 325, Expo-ro Yuseong-gu 34124 Daejeon / KR | 03 /
KIM, Yun Bong SK Innovation global technology, 325, Expo-ro Yuseong-gu 34124 Daejeon / KR | 04 /
LEE, Dong Yeon SK Innovation global technology, 325, Expo-ro Yuseong-gu 34124 Daejeon / KR | 05 /
CHO, Kyu Young SK Innovation global technology, 325, Expo-ro Yuseong-gu 34124 Daejeon / KR | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | [2020/18] | Application number, filing date | 19204321.4 | 21.10.2019 | [2020/18] | Priority number, date | KR20180126729 | 23.10.2018 Original published format: KR 20180126729 | [2020/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3644407 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/16, H01M10/0525 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M50/489 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/052 (CN,KR);
H01M50/461 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/058 (CN);
H01M50/403 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/409 (US);
H01M50/417 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/431 (KR);
H01M50/443 (KR);
H01M50/446 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/449 (KR);
H01M50/451 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/463 (KR);
H01M50/491 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEPARATOR FÜR SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND DENSELBEN VERWENDENDE ELEKTROCHEMISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2020/18] | English: | SEPARATOR FOR SECONDARY BATTERY AND ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICE USING THE SAME | [2020/18] | French: | SÉPARATEUR POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE L'UTILISANT | [2020/18] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 27.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]KR20160036988 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,5-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0010] , [0011] , [0014] , [0019] , [0020] , [0029] , [0040] , [0041] , [0045] , [0047] , [0048]; examples 1-4 * [A] 3,4; | [XA]KR20160041496 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,5-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0041] , [0042] , [0047] - [0051] - [0054]; examples 1,2 *[A] 3,4; | [X]KR20160065692 (SKC CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * example - * | by applicant | JP4414165B |