Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024229070 | ![]() | 11.07.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US202017125930 | 17.12.2020 | US202318525721 | 30.11.2023 | US201815997643 | 04.06.2018 | US201414348572 | 28.03.2014 | US201916665892 | 28.10.2019 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9988644 | ![]() | 05.06.2018 | B2 | US2014234278 | 21.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US201214348572 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11834668 | ![]() | 05.12.2023 | B2 | US2021171980 | 10.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US202017125930 | 17.12.2020 | US201815997643 | 04.06.2018 | US201414348572 | 28.03.2014 | US201916665892 | 28.10.2019 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10907177 | ![]() | 02.02.2021 | B2 | US2020048657 | 13.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US201815997643 | 04.06.2018 | US201414348572 | 28.03.2014 | US201916665892 | 28.10.2019 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10501759 | ![]() | 10.12.2019 | B2 | US2018363004 | 20.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US201815997643 | 04.06.2018 | US201414348572 | 28.03.2014 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102011532B | ![]() | 16.08.2019 | B1 | KR20140069315 | 09.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6285863B | ![]() | 28.02.2018 | B2 | JP2014530012 | 17.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL281045 | ![]() | 01.02.2022 | B | IL281045 | 29.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL231812 | ![]() | 25.03.2021 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4095236 | ![]() | 30.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | EP12836507 | 28.09.2012 | EP19204363 | 28.09.2012 | EP17173567 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3269802 | ![]() | 23.10.2019 | B1 | EP3269802 | 17.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | EP12836507 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2760994 | ![]() | 15.09.2021 | B2 | EP2760994 | 26.07.2017 | B8 | EP2760994 | 31.05.2017 | B1 | EP2760994 | 11.03.2015 | A4 | EP2760994 | 06.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108220246B | ![]() | 12.07.2022 | B | CN108220246 | 29.06.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | CN201280056851 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103958667 | ![]() | 30.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2850484 | ![]() | 26.01.2021 | C | CA2850484 | 04.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012315699B | ![]() | 17.08.2017 | B2 | AU2012315699 | 22.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3656848 | ![]() | 16.03.2022 | B1 | EP3656848 | 27.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | EP12836507 | 28.09.2012 | EP17173567 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112014007782 | 01.06.2021 | B1 | BR112014007782 | 11.04.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1122654T | 12.03.2021 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | EP12836507 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2760994T | 11.10.2021 | T4 | DK2760994T | 07.08.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3269802T | 03.02.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12836507 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA032699 | 31.07.2019 | B1 | EA201490627 | 28.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2632444T | 02.03.2022 | T5 | ES2632444T | 13.09.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN2518CHENP2014 | 31.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX359398 | 27.09.2018 | B | MX2014003923 | 07.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ623341 | 29.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201401077P | 28.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA114796 | 10.08.2017 | C2 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US57987 | 28.09.2012 | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013049615 | ![]() | 04.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6745826B | ![]() | 26.08.2020 | B2 | JP2018099124 | 28.06.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2769270T | 25.06.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2913633T | 03.06.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2018011791 | 08.12.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2760994T | 24.08.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3269802T | 28.01.2020 | T | Priority number | Date | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201602423T | 30.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161541736 | 30.09.2011 | Type | ![]() | EP4095236 | Type | ![]() | EP2760994 | EP3269802 |