EP3811825 - BULK BIN DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HL DISPLAY AB P.O. Box 1118 131 26 Nacka Strand / SE | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SJÖBERG, Mårten Heleneborgsgatan 30B 117 32 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
ERIKSSON, Linda Finnboda varvsväg 12A 131 72 Nacka / SE | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 19204591.2 | 22.10.2019 | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3811825 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3811825 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A47F1/02, // A47F3/02 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
A47F1/02 (EP);
A47F2003/021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] |
Former [2021/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHÜTTGUTBEHÄLTERVORRICHTUNG | [2021/17] | English: | BULK BIN DEVICE | [2021/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BAC DE STOCKAGE EN VRAC | [2021/17] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 28.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.11.2023 | CZ | 01.11.2023 | DK | 01.11.2023 | EE | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | IT | 01.11.2023 | LT | 01.11.2023 | LV | 01.11.2023 | NL | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SE | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | BG | 01.02.2024 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | PT | 01.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
CZ | 01.11.2023 | ||
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 01.11.2023 | |
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4205483 (CLARK LLOYD D [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 5; figure - * [A] 3-15; | [XAI]WO9908574 (KARAMELLKUNGEN I SVERIGE AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,9,11,13,14 * page 3, line 9 - page 6, line 21; figure - * [A] 3-8,10,12 [I] 15; | [XAI]US2009289061 (EYERMANN HENRIK [SE]) [X] 1,2,7-9,11,13 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0048]; figure - * [A] 3-6,10,12 [I] 14,15; | [AD]EP2394535 (HL DISPLAY AB [SE]) [AD] 15* Fig. 4 (22) discloses the features of the invention claim 15. * | by applicant | EP2394535 |