EP3812846 - DEVICE FOR ASSEMBLY AND ALIGNMENT, IN PARTICULAR FOR A TIMEPIECE RESONATOR MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETA SA Manufacture Horlogère Suisse Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 2540 Grenchen / CH | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINKLER, Pascal Grand'Rue 29 2072 St-Blaise / CH | 02 /
HELFER, Jean-Luc Rue du Jura 49 2525 Le Landeron / CH | 03 /
COURVOISIER, Raphaël Chemin de Closel 10 2035 Corcelles / CH | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | ICB SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital, 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 19205005.2 | 24.10.2019 | [2021/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3812846 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G04B29/02, G04B15/12, G04B35/00 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
G04B29/022 (EP,US);
G04B1/00 (RU);
G04B17/04 (CN);
G04B15/12 (EP);
G04B17/045 (EP,CN);
G04B17/063 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] |
Former [2021/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENBAU- UND AUSRICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG INSBESONDERE FÜR EINEN RESONATORMECHANISMUS EINES UHRWERKS | [2021/17] | English: | DEVICE FOR ASSEMBLY AND ALIGNMENT, IN PARTICULAR FOR A TIMEPIECE RESONATOR MECHANISM | [2021/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ASSEMBLAGE ET D'ALIGNEMENT, NOTAMMENT POUR UN MÉCANISME RÉSONATEUR D'HORLOGERIE | [2021/17] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 28.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]FR532255 (MONTRES ZENITH FAB DES) [X] 1,5,7,10 * page 1, lines 1-55; figure 1 * [A] 2-4,6,8,9,11-13,15,16[I] 14; | [XAI]CH709903 (MONTRES BREGUET SA [CH]) [X] 1,3,5-13,15,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] - [0068] * [A] 2,4 [I] 14; | [XAI]EP3144741 (VAUCHER MFT FLEURIER S A [CH]) [X] 1,3,6-12,16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0009] - [0019] - [0021] - [0037]; figures 1,2; claims 1,8 * [A] 2,4,5,13,15 [I] 14 |