Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3673898 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3673898



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 206
04.01.2024 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
23.11.2023 Decision to refuse according to the state of the file Search / examination 2
23.11.2023 Means of redress Search / examination 2
20.11.2023 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
09.11.2023 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
07.11.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.11.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.11.2023 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
04.05.2023 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
04.05.2023 Summons to attend oral proceedings and communication from Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.04.2023 Examination started Search / examination 1
29.12.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.12.2020 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
29.12.2020 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
29.12.2020 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
29.12.2020 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
29.12.2020 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 15
29.12.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.12.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.12.2020 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
20.11.2020 Payment submission rejected Search / examination 1
06.07.2020 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
03.07.2020 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
04.06.2020 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
03.06.2020 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.06.2020 European search opinion Search / examination 6
03.06.2020 European search report Search / examination 5
03.06.2020 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
25.05.2020 Search started Search / examination 1
16.03.2020 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
09.03.2020 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
03.02.2020 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
03.02.2020 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
27.01.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.01.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.01.2020 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
27.01.2020 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
24.01.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.01.2020 Claims Search / examination 4
24.01.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.01.2020 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 4
23.01.2020 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
18.12.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.12.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.12.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.12.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.12.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.12.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.11.2019 Invitation to file claims Search / examination 1
25.10.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.10.2019 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
25.10.2019 Description Search / examination 38
25.10.2019 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
25.10.2019 Drawings Search / examination 6
25.10.2019 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
17.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 45