EP3744696 - DENTAL BULK BLOCK FOR GRINDING PROCESSING AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hass Co., Ltd. 77-14, Gwahakdanji-ro Gangneung-si Gangwon-do 25452 / KR | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lim, Hyung Bong (Geongeon-dong, Geongeon E-pyunhansesang Apt.) 107-dong 2906-ho, 10, Geongeon 8-gil, Sangnok-gu 15521 Ansan-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Yong Su Lottecastle APT 102-dong 1203-ho, 12, Hwabusan-ro 99beon-gil 25497 Gangneung-si, Gangwon-do / KR | 03 /
Oh, Kyung Sik (Songdo-dong The Sharp Greenwallk 3rd) 1803-dong 603-ho, 100, Convensia-daero 130beon-gil 22003 Yeonsu-gu, Incheon / KR | 04 /
Hong, Young Pyo (Hoesan-dong, Seohee Strarhills riverpark Apt.) 101-dong 1404-ho, 344, Hoesan-ro 25599 Gangneung-si, Gangwon-do / KR | 05 /
Kim, Sung Min (Bojeong-dong, Haengwonmaeul Dong-A Solecity Apt.) 122-dong 1601-ho, 30, Bojeong-ro, Giheung-gu 16903 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Kim, Joon Hyung (Anseong Gongdo Kumho Eoulim) 304-dong 2002-ho,40 Gongdo 5-ro, Gongdo-eup 15760 Anseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 07 /
Son, Si Won (Silim-dong, Gwanak Ujeong Hivision Apt 1-danji) 101-dong 204-ho, 50-5, Yangji-gil, Gwanak-gu 08846 Seoul / KR | 08 /
Kim, Yena (Gaebong-dong, Kunyoung Apt.) 102-dong 104-ho 85-6, Gocheok-ro 21na-gil, Guro-gu 08250 Seoul / KR | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2020/49] | Application number, filing date | 19205590.3 | 28.10.2019 | [2020/49] | Priority number, date | KR20190063140 | 29.05.2019 Original published format: KR 20190063140 | [2020/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3744696 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/085, A61C13/08, A61C13/083, C03B33/02, C03C3/097, C03C10/00 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
C03C10/0027 (EP,US);
A61C13/0022 (EP,KR);
C03B27/012 (US);
A61C13/082 (EP);
A61C13/083 (EP,KR);
A61K6/836 (US);
A61K6/853 (US);
C03B32/02 (EP,CN,US);
C03C1/00 (CN);
C03C10/00 (CN);
C03C3/083 (KR);
C03C3/085 (EP,US);
C03C3/097 (EP,KR);
C03C4/0021 (CN,KR);
A61K6/818 (US);
A61K6/833 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZAHNMASSENBLOCK FÜR SCHLEIFBEARBEITUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2020/49] | English: | DENTAL BULK BLOCK FOR GRINDING PROCESSING AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2020/49] | French: | BLOC DENTAIRE EN VRAC POUR LE TRAITEMENT PAR MEULAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2020/49] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 21.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2023 | Observations by third parties | 12.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP23174516.7 / EP4234505 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3293157 (STRAUMANN HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0055] , [0 90] , [0 91] *; | [X]EP3372568 (HASS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0005] , [0 15] , [0 26] , [0 27]; claims 1-3 * | by applicant | KR101975548B | other | CH613679 | EP2804842 | US2015374589 | EP3135641 |