EP3817351 - A SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING ANALYTICS AND BLOCKING FRAUDULENT SUBSCRIBER IDENTITIES IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIGOS BVBA Bellevue 5 - 601 9050 Gent-Ledeberg / BE | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERLINDE, Dirk Rombout De Dopperestraat 10 8200 Sint-Andries / BE | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | IP HILLS NV Bellevue 5/501 9050 Gent-Ledeberg / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/18] | IP HILLS NV Hubert Frère-Orbanlaan 329 9000 Gent / BE | Application number, filing date | 19205634.9 | 28.10.2019 | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3817351 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/436, H04M7/00, H04W12/12 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
H04M3/436 (EP);
H04M7/0078 (EP);
H04W12/12 (EP);
H04M2203/6027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ANALYSE UND ZUR BLOCKIERUNG BETRÜGERISCHER TEILNEHMERIDENTITÄTEN IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | [2021/18] | English: | A SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING ANALYTICS AND BLOCKING FRAUDULENT SUBSCRIBER IDENTITIES IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2021/18] | French: | SYSTÈME PERMETTANT D'EFFECTUER UNE ANALYSE ET DE BLOQUER DES IDENTITÉS D'ABONNÉS FRAUDULEUSES DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION | [2021/18] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/18] | 14.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]WO2017180512 (TATA COMMUNICATIONS (AMERICA) INC [US]) [X] 1,5,12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0025] , [0037] - [0042] - [0079] , [0085]; figure 1; claim 2 * [A] 2,3 [Y] 7,11 [I] 4,6,8-10; | [Y]US2010074420 (BAUCHOT FREDERIC J [FR], et al) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0015] *; | [Y]US2019068783 (ARCHER DUNCAN [GB]) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0033] - [0040] *; | [X]US6404871 (SPRINGER ARTHUR L [US], et al) [X] 1,5,12 * column 1, line 50 - column 5, line 46 * | by applicant | US2009069047 | EP2671372 | EP2509294 | EP2547083 | WO2017167900 | EP3119072 |