EP3647187 - LANDING GEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations Limited Pegasus House Aerospace Avenue Filton Bristol BS34 7PA / GB | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITE, Nick c/o AIRBUS OPERATIONS LIMITED, IP Dept Pegasus House Aerospace Avenue Filton Bristol, BS34 7PA / GB | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [2023/23] |
Former [2020/19] | Abel & Imray Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19206100.0 | 30.10.2019 | [2020/19] | Priority number, date | GB20180017731 | 30.10.2018 Original published format: GB 201817731 | [2020/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3647187 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3647187 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B64C25/26, B64C25/14, // B64C25/12, B64C25/20, B64C25/10 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
B64C25/26 (EP,CN,GB);
B64C25/14 (EP,CN,US);
B64C25/20 (EP,US);
B64C25/10 (EP);
B64C25/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/19] | B64C25/26, // B64C25/12, B64C25/20, B64C25/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] |
Former [2020/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FAHRWERK | [2020/19] | English: | LANDING GEAR | [2020/19] | French: | TRAIN D'ATTERRISSAGE | [2020/19] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 06.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2023 | CZ | 07.06.2023 | DK | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | IT | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | NL | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SE | 07.06.2023 | SI | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | PT | 09.10.2023 | LU | 30.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
IT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
LU | 30.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
IT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
LU | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
IT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
IT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB626280 (ELECTRO HYDRAULICS LTD, et al) [X] 1-8,11-14 * abstract * * page 2, lines 96-115 *[I] 10; | [XI]US2010012779 (COLLINS ANDREW JOHN [GB]) [X] 1,5-9,13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0 15] - [0018] * [I] 10; | [XAI]US2015175255 (GUERING BERNARD [FR]) [X] 1-5,7,8,11-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] , [0 23] - [0031] * [A] 9 [I] 10; | [XI]FR3064596 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS SAS [FR]) [X] 1-5,7,8,11-14 * abstract * * page 9, line 29 - page 10, line 11 * [I] 10 | Examination | NZ582291 | by applicant | US8070094 | US8523106 | US9555877 |