EP3817002 - SYSTEM FOR ANONYMIZING PATIENT DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gotthardt Healthgroup AG Hauptstrasse 90 69117 Heidelberg / DE | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTTHARDT, Daniel c/o Gotthardt Healthgroup AG Hauptstraße 90 69117 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
PETER, Sven c/o Gotthardt Healthgroup AG Hauptstraße 90 69117 Heidelberg / DE | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Richardt Patentanwälte PartG mbB Wilhelmstraße 7 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19206146.3 | 30.10.2019 | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3817002 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G16H10/00, G16H10/20, G16H50/70, G06F21/62, H04W12/02 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
G16H10/60 (EP);
G06F21/6254 (EP,US);
G16H50/70 (EP);
H04L63/0407 (EP);
H04L9/0825 (US);
H04W12/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ANONYMISIERUNG VON PATIENTENDATEN | [2021/18] | English: | SYSTEM FOR ANONYMIZING PATIENT DATA | [2021/18] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ANONYMISATION DE DONNÉES DE PATIENTS | [2021/18] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 16.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2019258824 (GKOULALAS-DIVANIS ARIS [US]) [I] 1-18* paragraphs [0047] , [0021] , [0033] , [0023] , [0055] * | by applicant | WO2019097327 | - "A General Survey of Privacy-Preserving Data Mining Models and Algorithms", AGGARWALCHARU C.YUPHILIP S., Privacy-Preserving Data Mining - Models and Algorithms, Springer, (20080000), pages 11 - 52 |