EP3660493 - FLUORESCENT PENETRANT INSPECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2020/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIAN, Xiao General Electric Company 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 02 /
KARIGIANNIS, John General Electric Company 2 De L'Aeroport Boulevard Bromont, Québec J2L 1S6 / CA | 03 /
HAREL, Stephane General Electric Company 2 De L'Aeroport Boulevard Bromont, Québec J2L 1S6 / CA | 04 /
BOUCHARD, Steeves General Electric Company 2 De L'Aeroport Boulevard Bromont, Québec J2L 1S6 / CA | 05 /
POULIOT, Maxime, Beaudoin General Electric Company 2 De L'Aeroport Boulevard Bromont, Québec J2L 1S6 / CA | 06 /
GRADY, Wayne General Electric Company 1 Nuemann Way Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US | 07 /
DIWINSKY, David, Scott General Electric Company 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US | 08 /
BEWLAY, Bernard, Patrick General Electric Company 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2020/23] | Application number, filing date | 19206684.3 | 31.10.2019 | [2020/23] | Priority number, date | US201816201322 | 27.11.2018 Original published format: US201816201322 | [2020/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3660493 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3660493 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/88, G01N21/91, G01N21/95, G06T7/00 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
G01N21/91 (EP,US);
G01N21/6428 (CN);
G01N21/643 (US);
G01N21/6456 (US);
G01N21/9515 (EP);
G06T7/001 (EP);
G01N2021/6439 (CN,US);
G01N2021/8883 (EP);
G06T2207/10064 (EP);
G06T2207/30164 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/23] | G01N21/88, G01N21/91 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] |
Former [2020/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUORESZENZEINDRINGPRÜFSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2020/23] | English: | FLUORESCENT PENETRANT INSPECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2020/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'INSPECTION DE PÉNÉTRANT FLUORESCENT | [2020/23] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 04.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007217672 (SHANNON ROBERT E [US], et al); | [A]US2012249779 (JI WON SOO [KR], et al); | [XI]US10060857 (BOUCHARD STEEVES [CA], et al) |