Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024229685 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2024 | A9 | US2024133321 | 25.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19206843 | 04.11.2019 | WO2020EP69988 | 15.07.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102654114B | Global Dossier | 04.04.2024 | B1 | KR20220090569 | 29.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19206843 | 04.11.2019 | WO2020EP69988 | 15.07.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7459241B | Global Dossier | 01.04.2024 | B2 | JP2023500196 | 05.01.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19206843 | 04.11.2019 | WO2020EP69988 | 15.07.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4004349 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2023 | C0 | EP4004349 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2023 | B1 | EP4004349 | 01.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19206843 | 04.11.2019 | WO2020EP69988 | 15.07.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2964929T | 10.04.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP19206843 | 04.11.2019 | WO2020EP69988 | 15.07.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021089204 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19206843 | 04.11.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3816413 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19206843 | 04.11.2019 |