EP3651432 - SELECTION OF IP VERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NO | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2024/07] |
Former [2020/20] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACKMAN, Jan Snäckliden 24 442 71 Kärna / SE | 02 /
ROMMER, Stefan Skogsrydsgatan 7 426 74 Västra Frölunda / SE | [2020/20] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2020/20] | Application number, filing date | 19206947.4 | 09.05.2018 | [2020/20] | Priority number, date | US201762503519P | 09.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762503519 P | [2020/20] | Previously filed application, date | WO2018EP61996 | 09.05.2018 | [2020/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3651432 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3651432 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L69/167 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
H04L69/167 (EP,US);
H04W80/045 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (US);
H04W76/12 (EP,US);
H04W76/15 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/20] | H04L29/06, H04W80/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] |
Former [2020/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUSWAHL DER IP-VERSION | [2020/20] | English: | SELECTION OF IP VERSION | [2020/20] | French: | SÉLECTION DE VERSION IP | [2020/20] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 11.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18723505.6 / EP3476100 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NO | 14.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2009232022 (SAVOLAINEN TEEMU ILMARI [FI], et al); | Examination | WO2017078776 |