Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024186484 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202418404251 | 04.01.2024 | US202318170578 | 17.02.2023 | CN201811309419 | 05.11.2018 | US201916298089 | 11.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11923530 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2024 | B2 | US2023197926 | 22.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318170578 | 17.02.2023 | CN201811309419 | 05.11.2018 | US201916298089 | 11.03.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN118645634 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201811309419 | 05.11.2018 | CN202410725298 | 05.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN118630223 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201811309419 | 05.11.2018 | CN202410722250 | 05.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN118610551 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202410722262 | 05.11.2018 | CN201811309419 | 05.11.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN118588948 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202410721359 | 05.11.2018 | CN201811309419 | 05.11.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11616223 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2023 | B2 | US2020144595 | 07.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201811309419 | 05.11.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109244475B | Global Dossier | 21.06.2024 | B | CN109244475 | 18.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201811309419 | 05.11.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3648225 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2020 | A3 | EP3648225 | 06.05.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CN201811309419 | 05.11.2018 |