EP3648225 - ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ningde Amperex Technology Limited No.1 Xin Gang Road Zhang Wan Town JiaoCheng District Ningde City, Fujian Province, 352100 / CN | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Chaowang c/o Ningde Amperex Technology Limited No. 1 XinGang Road, ZhangWan Town JiaoCheng District Ningde City, Fujian Province, 352100 / CN | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 19207091.0 | 05.11.2019 | [2020/19] | Priority number, date | CN201811309419 | 05.11.2018 Original published format: CN201811309419 | [2020/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3648225 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3648225 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0525, H01M10/42, H01M4/525, H01M4/36, H01M4/58, // H01M4/02, H01M4/587, H01M10/0587 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/667 (CN);
H01M4/131 (US);
H01M10/0587 (EP,CN);
H01M10/4235 (EP);
H01M4/133 (US);
H01M4/134 (US);
H01M4/366 (EP);
H01M4/525 (EP,US);
H01M4/58 (EP);
H01M2004/028 (EP);
H01M4/587 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] |
Former [2020/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2020/19] | English: | ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING SAME | [2020/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE LE COMPRENANT | [2020/19] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 16.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JP2009099495 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]US2009117457 (DAVIS STEVEN [US], et al); | [A]US2017256788 (UMEYAMA HIROYA [JP], et al); | [X]JP2018170142 (TDK CORP) |