EP3627207 - OPTICAL DEVICE FOR CONOSCOPIC LIGHTING WITH HOLLOW CONE FOR OPTICAL MICROSCOPE AND METHOD FOR OPTICAL MICROSCOPY IN CONOSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Horiba France SAS 16-18 Rue du Canal 91160 Longjumeau / FR | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FROIGNEUX, Emmanuel 29 Rue des Contes 59650 VILLEUNEUVE D'ASCQ / FR | 02 /
SCHREIBER, JOACHIM 159 ALLEE CHARDIN 59650 VILLENEUVE D'ASCQ / FR | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Jacobacci Coralis Harle 32, rue de l'Arcade 75008 Paris / FR | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 19207202.3 | 20.07.2012 | [2020/13] | Priority number, date | FR20110056687 | 22.07.2011 Original published format: FR 1156687 | [2020/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3627207 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3627207 | Date: | 16.10.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/08, G02B5/00, G02B27/28, G01J4/00, G01J3/02, G01N21/65, G01N21/21 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
G01N21/211 (EP,US);
G02B21/10 (US);
G01J3/0208 (EP,US);
G01J3/0224 (EP,US);
G01J3/0256 (US);
G01J3/10 (US);
G01J3/44 (US);
G01J4/00 (US);
G01N21/65 (US);
G02B21/084 (EP,US);
G02B21/16 (US);
G02B27/286 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] |
Former [2020/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KONOSKOPISCHE OPTISCHE BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM HOHLKONUS FÜR OPTISCHES MIKROSKOP, UND KONOSKOPISCHES OPTISCHES MIKROSKOPIEVERFAHREN | [2020/13] | English: | OPTICAL DEVICE FOR CONOSCOPIC LIGHTING WITH HOLLOW CONE FOR OPTICAL MICROSCOPE AND METHOD FOR OPTICAL MICROSCOPY IN CONOSCOPY | [2020/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE D'ÉCLAIRAGE CONOSCOPIQUE À CÔNE CREUX POUR MICROSCOPE OPTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MICROSCOPIE OPTIQUE EN CONOSCOPIE | [2020/13] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 18.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12750437.1 / EP2734884 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 04.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2001012154 (SCHUSTER KARL-HEINZ [DE]) [Y] 1,8 * paragraphs [0047] , [0051] * * figures 4a,5 *; | [YA]US2006146384 (SCHULTZ JOERG [DE], et al) [Y] 2 * figure 19 *[A] 1,3-14; | [XY]US2006170901 (TANITSU OSAMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraphs [0017] , [0050] , [0051] , [0060] , [0061] , [0072] , [0 74] , [0088] , [0145] , [0147] * * figures 1,5,7 * [Y] 1,2,8 | by applicant | FR1055839 | FR2784749 | - M. V. SCHULMERICH et al., "Dark field Raman microscopy", Anal. Chem., (20100000), vol. 82, pages 6273 - 6280 |