05.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
12.04.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
17.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
05.05.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
15.03.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
15.03.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.03.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
01.12.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.11.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.08.2022 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
13.04.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.11.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.11.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
12.11.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
12.11.2021 |
Change - designated states |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
09.04.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.05.2021 [2021/19] |
08.11.2019 |
Change - representative |
|