EP3819167 - LOAD LIFTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmid, Felix Neugasse 16 8280 Kreuzlingen / CH | [2021/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [2023/23] |
Former [2021/19] | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 19207341.9 | 06.11.2019 | [2021/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3819167 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3819167 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/44 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
B60P1/4471 (EP,US);
B60P1/4407 (EP,US);
B60P1/4414 (US);
B60P1/4492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] |
Former [2021/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LASTENHEBEVORRICHTUNG | [2021/19] | English: | LOAD LIFTING DEVICE | [2021/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LEVAGE DE CHARGES | [2021/19] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 04.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 07.09.2023 | |
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 07.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2245499 (COLAS DES FRANCS HUBERT [FR]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 25 - page 4, line 24 ** figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2438008 (COLAS DES FRANCS HUBERT) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 5 - page 6, line 40 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0359600 (ERHEL [FR]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 35 * * figures 5-8 *; | [A]DE202004004127U (MAIER GMBH PETER [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0040] * * figure 6 * |