EP3666886 - THERAPEUTIC PEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc. 450 Brookline Avenue Boston, MA 02115-5450 / US | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WUCHERPFENNIG, Kai W. 67 Highland Road Brookline, MA Massachusetts 02445 / US | 02 /
DRANOFF, Glenn 150 Concord Road Sudbury, MA Massachusetts 01776 / US | 03 /
HODI, F., Stephen 15 Vaillencourt Drive Framingham, MA Massachusetts 02115 / US | 04 /
FRANZ, Bettina 9 Sherman House Rustat Avenue Cambridge, MA CB1 3RF GB / GB | 05 /
MAY, Kenneth, F. 3141 madrona Lane Bozeman, MT 59715 / US | 06 /
HARVEY, Christopher 8 Conway Street Boston, MA Massachusetts 02131 / US | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 19207376.5 | 14.03.2014 | [2020/25] | Priority number, date | US201361792034P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361792034 P | US201361913198P | 06.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361913198 P | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3666886 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/0783, A61K39/395, A61K35/14, C07K16/28, A61K35/17, A61K38/12, A61K38/15, A61P35/00, A61K45/06, // A61K39/00 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
C07K16/2833 (EP,US);
A61K38/12 (EP,US);
A61K38/15 (EP,US);
A61K39/39558 (EP,US);
A61K39/4613 (EP);
A61K39/4644 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61N5/10 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/30 (US);
C07K16/3015 (US);
C07K16/3023 (US);
C07K16/3053 (US);
C07K16/3061 (US);
C07K16/3069 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K35/17 (US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/15, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K39/39558, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHE PEPTIDE | [2020/25] | English: | THERAPEUTIC PEPTIDES | [2020/25] | French: | PEPTIDES THÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/25] | 09.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14720000.0 / EP2970908 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2013049517 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]); | by applicant | EP0154316 | WO8807054 | WO8807089 | EP0401384 | US5122464 | US5225539 | WO9429351 | US5530101 | WO9632478 | US5585089 | US5591639 | US5624821 | US5648260 | US5658759 | WO9734631 | US5677425 | US5693762 | US5714350 | US5869046 | WO9951642 | WO9954342 | US5981216 | WO0042072 | US6121022 | US6165745 | US6180370 | US6194551 | WO0158957 | US6277375 | WO0206919 | EP1176195 | US6350861 | US2003022450 | WO03035835 | US2003153043 | WO03074679 | WO2004016750 | US2004067503 | WO2004029207 | WO2004035752 | US6737056 | WO2004063351 | WO2004074455 | WO2004099249 | WO2005008957 | WO2005040217 | WO2005070963 | WO2005092925 | WO2006020114 | US7317091 | US2010261269 | US8101720 |