EP3657775 - PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION DEVICE, METHOD OF DRIVING PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION DEVICE, IMAGING SYSTEM, AND MOVING BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2020/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTA, Yasuharu c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA; 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
KURODA, Yukihiro c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA; 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2020/22] | Application number, filing date | 19207569.5 | 07.11.2019 | [2020/22] | Priority number, date | JP20180218224 | 21.11.2018 Original published format: JP 2018218224 | [2020/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3657775 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3657775 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N25/772, H04N25/62 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
H04N25/773 (EP,CN);
H04N25/70 (CN);
G01J1/44 (US);
G05D1/0246 (US);
G05D1/249 (US);
H04N23/651 (CN);
H04N25/709 (US);
H04N25/75 (US);
H04N25/76 (US);
H04N25/77 (EP,CN);
H04N25/78 (CN);
G01J2001/442 (US);
G01J2001/4466 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/22] | H04N5/359, H04N5/3745 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] |
Former [2020/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PHOTOELEKTRISCHE UMWANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR ANSTEUERUNG EINER PHOTOELEKTRISCHE UMWANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDGEBUNGSSYSTEM UND BEWEGLICHER KÖRPER | [2023/51] | English: | PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION DEVICE, METHOD OF DRIVING PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION DEVICE, IMAGING SYSTEM, AND MOVING BODY | [2020/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION PHOTOÉLECTRIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION PHOTOÉLECTRIQUE, SYSTÈME D'IMAGERIE ET CORPS MOBILE | [2023/51] |
Former [2020/22] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR PHOTOELEKTRISCHEN UMWANDLUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR ANSTEUERUNG EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUR PHOTOELEKTRISCHEN UMWANDLUNG, BILDGEBUNGSSYSTEM UND BEWEGLICHES OBJEKT | ||
Former [2020/22] | DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION PHOTOÉLECTRIQUE, PROCÉDÉ D'ENTRAÎNEMENT DE DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION PHOTOÉLECTRIQUE, SYSTÈME D'IMAGERIE ET CORPS MOBILE | Examination procedure | 16.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 27.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.11.2023 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2016003451 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al); | [XI]WO2017219223 (SHENZHEN GENORIVISION TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [XP]JP2019009768 (CANON KK); | Examination | EP3503534 | by applicant | US2011266420 |