EP3627168 - FLOW BATTERY BASED ON REDUNDANCY DESIGN OF SOC DETECTION DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dalian Rongke Power Co., Ltd. No.22 Xinda Street High-Tech Industrial Zone Dalian, Liaoning 116025 / CN | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Yu Dalian Rongke Power Co., Ltd. No.22 Xinda Street High-Tech Industrial Zone Dalian, Liaoning 116025 / CN | 02 /
ZOU, Yi Dalian Rongke Power Co., Ltd. No.22 Xinda Street High-Tech Industrial Zone Dalian, Liaoning 116025 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Huamin Dalian Rongke Power Co., Ltd. No.22 Xinda Street High-Tech Industrial Zone Dalian, Liaoning 116025 / CN | 04 /
LI, Ying Dalian Rongke Power Co., Ltd. No.22 Xinda Street High-Tech Industrial Zone Dalian, Liaoning 116025 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Xiaoli Dalian Rongke Power Co., Ltd. No.22 Xinda Street High-Tech Industrial Zone Dalian, Liaoning 116025 / CN | 06 /
HAN, Xi Dalian Rongke Power Co., Ltd. No.22 Xinda Street High-Tech Industrial Zone Dalian, Liaoning 116025 / CN | 07 /
HAN, Lecong Dalian Rongke Power Co., Ltd. No.22 Xinda Street High-Tech Industrial Zone Dalian, Liaoning 116025 / CN | 08 /
ZHANG, Tao Dalian Rongke Power Co., Ltd. No.22 Xinda Street High-Tech Industrial Zone Dalian, Liaoning 116025 / CN | 09 /
MA, Xiangkun Dalian Rongke Power Co., Ltd. No.22 Xinda Street High-Tech Industrial Zone Dalian, Liaoning 116025 / CN | 10 /
ZHAO, Honggui Dalian Rongke Power Co., Ltd. No.22 Xinda Street High-Tech Industrial Zone Dalian, Liaoning 116025 / CN | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Proi World Intellectual Property GmbH Obermattweg 12 6052 Hergiswil, Kanton Nidwalden / CH | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 19208348.3 | 03.11.2015 | [2020/13] | Priority number, date | CN201410613631 | 03.11.2014 Original published format: CN201410613631 | CN201510613258 | 23.09.2015 Original published format: CN201510613258 | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3627168 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3627168 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/36, H01M8/18, H01M8/20, H01M8/04537, H01M10/48 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
H01M8/04611 (EP,US);
G01R31/367 (US);
H01M8/188 (US);
H01M8/20 (EP,US);
H01M2250/10 (US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | DURCHFLUSSBATTERIE ENTWICKELT MIT REDUNDANZ VON SOC-ERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN | [2020/13] | English: | FLOW BATTERY BASED ON REDUNDANCY DESIGN OF SOC DETECTION DEVICES | [2020/13] | French: | BATTERIE À FLUX BASÉE SUR UNE CONCEPTION COMPORTANT UNE REDONDANCE DE DISPOSITIFS DE DÉTECTION DE TYPE SOC | [2020/13] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 21.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15856903.8 / EP3214455 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.11.2015 | AL | 19.10.2022 | AT | 19.10.2022 | BG | 19.10.2022 | CY | 19.10.2022 | CZ | 19.10.2022 | DK | 19.10.2022 | EE | 19.10.2022 | ES | 19.10.2022 | FI | 19.10.2022 | HR | 19.10.2022 | IT | 19.10.2022 | LT | 19.10.2022 | LV | 19.10.2022 | MC | 19.10.2022 | MK | 19.10.2022 | NL | 19.10.2022 | PL | 19.10.2022 | RO | 19.10.2022 | RS | 19.10.2022 | SE | 19.10.2022 | SI | 19.10.2022 | SK | 19.10.2022 | SM | 19.10.2022 | TR | 19.10.2022 | IE | 03.11.2022 | LU | 03.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | NO | 19.01.2023 | GR | 20.01.2023 | IS | 19.02.2023 | PT | 20.02.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 03.11.2015 | |
AL | 19.10.2022 | ||
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CY | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
IT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
MK | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
TR | 19.10.2022 | ||
IE | 03.11.2022 | ||
LU | 03.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 03.11.2015 | |
AL | 19.10.2022 | ||
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CY | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
IT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
MK | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
IE | 03.11.2022 | ||
LU | 03.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 03.11.2015 | |
AL | 19.10.2022 | ||
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CY | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
IT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
IE | 03.11.2022 | ||
LU | 03.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 03.11.2015 | |
AL | 19.10.2022 | ||
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CY | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
IE | 03.11.2022 | ||
LU | 03.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 03.11.2015 | |
AL | 19.10.2022 | ||
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
IE | 03.11.2022 | ||
LU | 03.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
IE | 03.11.2022 | ||
LU | 03.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
IE | 03.11.2022 | ||
LU | 03.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
IE | 03.11.2022 | ||
LU | 03.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
LU | 03.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
LU | 03.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 19.10.2022 | |
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 19.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9003666 (UNISEARCH LTD [AU]) [I] 1-8 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 20, paragraph 1 * * page 22, paragraph 1 - page 35, line 1 *; | [A]WO2008148148 (FUEL PTY LTD V [AU], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 7, line 3 - page 12, line 32 * * page 14, line 15 - page 21, line 21 *; | [I]JP2009303306 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [I] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]US2013011704 (HORNE CRAIG RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0271] *; | [A]CN103197257 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-8* abstract *; | [I]US2014095089 (WU ZHIJIAN JAMES [US], et al) [I] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0037] *; | [I]US2014212714 (BUTZMANN STEFAN [DE]) [I] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * |