Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
13.10.2023 | First examination report | |
12.10.2023 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
30.05.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.05.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.05.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
29.05.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.03.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
06.03.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
12.11.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.11.2019 | Change - representative |