Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9926392 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2018 | B2 | US2017218101 | 03.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715487570 | 14.04.2017 | US201414282737 | 20.05.2014 | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9650463 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2017 | B2 | US2014343192 | 20.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414282737 | 20.05.2014 | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10752711 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2020 | B2 | US2018305478 | 25.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816020818 | 27.06.2018 | US201715487570 | 14.04.2017 | US201414282737 | 20.05.2014 | US201815895888 | 13.02.2018 | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10730975 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2020 | B2 | US2019002608 | 03.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715487570 | 14.04.2017 | US201414282737 | 20.05.2014 | US201815895888 | 13.02.2018 | US201816123601 | 06.09.2018 | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10093758 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2018 | B2 | US2018171045 | 21.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715487570 | 14.04.2017 | US201414282737 | 20.05.2014 | US201815895888 | 13.02.2018 | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20160009583 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US38799 | 20.05.2014 | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016528306 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US38799 | 20.05.2014 | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3327047 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14732720 | 20.05.2014 | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2999727 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2019 | B1 | EP2999727 | 30.03.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US38799 | 20.05.2014 | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108641054 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201480029039 | 20.05.2014 | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108641053B | Global Dossier | 23.04.2021 | B | CN108641053 | 12.10.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201480029039 | 20.05.2014 | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105229045B | Global Dossier | 13.07.2018 | B | CN105229045 | 06.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US38799 | 20.05.2014 | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014268692B | Global Dossier | 01.02.2018 | B2 | AU2014268692 | 12.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US38799 | 20.05.2014 | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3632942 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US38799 | 20.05.2014 | EP14732720 | 20.05.2014 | EP18150507 | 20.05.2014 | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015028368 | 15.12.2020 | B1 | BR112015028368 | 25.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US38799 | 20.05.2014 | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122017010545 | 01.12.2020 | B1 | BR122017010545 | 03.09.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US38799 | 20.05.2014 | BR112015028368 | 20.05.2014 | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2910680 | 27.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US38799 | 20.05.2014 | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA201592176 | 29.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US38799 | 20.05.2014 | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1220219 | 28.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US38799 | 20.05.2014 | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12015502467 | 22.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US38799 | 20.05.2014 | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201509408U | 30.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US38799 | 20.05.2014 | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014189939 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2015 | A3 | WO2014189939 | 27.11.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2015003375 | 05.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201606740Q | 28.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201606742U | 28.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361825241 | 20.05.2013 | Type | Earlier application | EP2999727 | EP3327047 |