EP3632942 - THERMOPLASTIC ELASTOMERS VIA REVERSIBLE ADDITION-FRAGMENTATION CHAIN TRANSFER POLYMERIZATION OF TRIGLYCERIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iowa State University Research Foundation, Inc. 1805 Collaboration Place, Suite 2100 Ames, IA 50010 / US | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COCHRAN, Eric W 615 Shelley Avenue Ames, Iowa 50014 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMS, Ronald Christopher 2311 Cottonwood Road Ames, Iowa 50014 / US | 03 /
HERNANDEZ, Nacu 4902 Clemens Boulevard Ames, Iowa 50014 / US | 04 /
CASCIONE, Andrew 428 S. Walnut Avenue Unit 30 Ames, Iowa 50010 / US | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 19208355.8 | 20.05.2014 | [2020/15] | Priority number, date | US201361825241P | 20.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361825241 P | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3632942 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08F242/00, C08L95/00, C09J191/00, C08F22/26, C08F222/10, C09F7/06 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
C08F242/00 (EP,US);
C08F122/20 (US);
C08F222/1006 (EP);
C08F293/00 (US);
C08F293/005 (US);
C08F8/04 (EP,US);
C08L35/06 (US);
C08L53/00 (US);
C08L95/00 (EP,US);
C09J135/06 (US);
C09J153/00 (US);
C08F222/103 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F212/08, C08F222/10 (US);
C08F212/08, C08F222/103 (US,EP);
C08L53/00, C08L95/00 (US);
C08L95/00, C08L53/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHE ELASTOMERE DURCH RAFT-POLYMERISATION VON TRIGLYCERIDEN | [2020/15] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC ELASTOMERS VIA REVERSIBLE ADDITION-FRAGMENTATION CHAIN TRANSFER POLYMERIZATION OF TRIGLYCERIDES | [2020/15] | French: | ÉLASTOMÈRES THERMOPLASTIQUES PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE D'UNE POLYMÉRISATION RÉVERSIBLE CONTRÔLÉE PAR TRANSFERT DE CHAÎNE PAR ADDITION-FRAGMENTATION DE TRIGLYCÉRIDES | [2020/15] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 02.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14732720.9 / EP2999727 | EP18150507.4 / EP3327047 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012316309 (CHISHOLM BRET JA [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0075] - [0077] - [0 92]; figures 3, 4; examples III, VIII; claims 1-28 *; | [XP]WO2013109878 (UNIV IOWA STATE RES FOUND INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-17 * paragraphs [0142] , [ 0153]; figure 12; examples 1-3; claims 1-70; table 3 *; | [T] - MENGGUO YAN ET AL, "Gel Point Suppression in RAFT Polymerization of Pure Acrylic Cross-Linker Derived from Soybean Oil", BIOMACROMOLECULES, US, (20160808), vol. 17, no. 8, doi:10.1021/acs.biomac.6b00745, ISSN 1525-7797, pages 2701 - 2709, XP055668801 [T] 1-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.biomac.6b00745 | by applicant | US6121398 | - ANDJELKOVIC et al., "Novel Polymeric Materials from Soybean Oils: Synthesis, Properties, and Potential Applications", ACS Symposium Series, (20060000), vol. 921, pages 67 - 81 | - DANIELLAROCK, "Thermophysical properties of conjugated soybean oil/corn stover biocomposites", Bioresource Technology, (20100000), vol. 101, no. 15, pages 6200 - 06, XP027018569 | - LU et al., "New Sheet Molding Compound Resins From Soybean Oil. I. Synthesis and Characterization", Polymer, (20050000), vol. 46, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.polymer.2004.10.060, pages 71 - 80, XP004678185 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymer.2004.10.060 | - LU et al., "Surfactant-Free Core-Shell Hybrid Latexes From Soybean Oil-Based Waterborne Polyurethanes and Poly(Styrene-Butyl Acrylate", Progress in Organic Coatings, (20110000), vol. 71, no. 4, pages 336 - 42 | - ZHU et al., "Nanoclay Reinforced Bio-Based Elastomers: Synthesis and Characterization", Polymer, (20060000), vol. 47, no. 24, doi:10.1016/j.polymer.2006.07.076, pages 8106 - 15, XP028061199 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymer.2006.07.076 | - BUNKER et al., "Miniemulsion Polymerization of Acrylated Methyl Oleate for Pressure Sensitive Adhesives", International Journal of Adhesion and Adhesives, (20030000), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 29 - 38 | - BUNKER et al., "Synthesis and Characterization of Monomers and Polymers for Adhesives from Methyl Oleate", Journal of Polymer Science Part A: Polymer Chemistry, (20020000), vol. 40, no. 4, doi:10.1002/pola.10130, pages 451 - 58, XP008092333 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pola.10130 | - BONNAILLIE et al., "Thermosetting Foam With a High Bio-Based Content From Acrylated Epoxidized Soybean Oil and Carbon Dioxide", Journal of Applied Polymer Science, (20070000), vol. 105, no. 3, doi:10.1002/app.26182, pages 1042 - 52, XP002696771 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.26182 | - MOAD et al., "Living Radical Polymerization by the Raft Process- a Second Update", Australian Journal of Chemistry, (20090000), vol. 62, no. 11, pages 1402 - 72 | - MOAD et al., "Living Radical Polymerization by the Raft Process- a First Update", Australian Journal of Chemistry, (20060000), vol. 59, pages 669 - 92 | - MOAD et al., "Living Radical Polymerization by the Raft Process- a Third Update", Australian Journal of Chemistry, (20120000), vol. 65, pages 985 - 1076 | - SKEY et al., "Facile one pot synthesis of a range of reversible addition-fragmentation chain transfer (RAFT) agents", Chemical Communications, (20080000), vol. 35, pages 4183 - 85 | - LI et al., "Soybean Oil-Divinylbenzene Thermosetting Polymers: Synthesis, Structure, Properties and their Relationships", Polymer, (20010000), vol. 42, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S0032-3861(00)00546-2, pages 1567 - 1579, XP004219074 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0032-3861(00)00546-2 | - HENNA et al., "Biobased Thermosets from Free Radical Copolymerization of Conjugated Linseed Oil", Journal of Applied Polymer Science, (20070000), vol. 104, pages 979 - 985 | - VALVERDE et al., "Conjugated Low-Saturation Soybean Oil Thermosets: Free-Radical Copolymerization with Dicyclopentadiene and Divinylbenzene", Journal of Applied Polymer Science, (20080000), vol. 107, pages 423 - 430 | - ROBERTSON et al., "Toughening of Polylactide with Polymerized Soybean Oil", Macromolecules, (20100000), vol. 43, pages 1807 - 1814 | - LAROCK et al., "Preparation of Conjugated Soybean Oil and Other Natural Oils and Fatty Acids by Homogeneous Transition Metal Catalysis", Journal of the American Oil Chemists' Society, (20010000), vol. 78, pages 447 - 453 | - WIDIN et al., "Unexpected Consequences of Block Polydispersity on the Self-Assembly of ABA Triblock Copolymers", Journal of the American Chemical Society, (20120000), vol. 134, no. 8, pages 3834 - 44 | - BATES et al., "Block Copolymers-Designer Soft Materials", Physics Today, (19990000), vol. 52, no. 2, doi:10.1063/1.882522, pages 32 - 38, XP055214563 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.882522 | - YANG et al., "Conjugation of Soybean Oil and It's Free-Radical Copolymerization with Acrylonitrile", Journal of Polymers and the Environment, (20100000), pages 1 - 7 | - TASDELEN et al., "Telechelic Polymers by Living and Controlled/Living Polymerization Methods", Progress in Polymer Science, (20110000), vol. 36, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2010.10.002, pages 455 - 567, XP028128750 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2010.10.002 | - MOAD et al., "Living Radical Polymerization by the Raft Process-a Second Update", Australian Journal of Chemistry, (20090000), vol. 62, no. 11, pages 1402 - 72 |