EP3659520 - BONE MARROW ASPIRATION DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teleflex Life Sciences Limited 171, Old Bakery Street Valletta VLT 1455 / MT | [2023/29] |
Former [2020/23] | For all designated states Teleflex Medical Devices S.à.r.l. 560A Rue de Neudorf 2220 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Larry J. 16260 Highway 46 Spring Branch, TX 78070 / US | 02 /
TITKEMEYER, Robert W. 1402 Aylsbury San Antonio, TX 78216 / US | 03 /
BOLLETER, David S. 13023 Mahogany Run San Antonio, TX 78232 / US | 04 /
KILCOIN, Christopher Brian 339 Prospect St. La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2020/23] | Application number, filing date | 19208602.3 | 11.09.2007 | [2020/23] | Priority number, date | US20060825325P | 12.09.2006 Original published format: US 825325 P | US20070910122P | 04.04.2007 Original published format: US 910122 P | [2020/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3659520 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3659520 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3659520 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/02, A61B17/16, A61B46/00, A61B46/10, A61B50/33, A61B50/30, // A61B17/32, A61B17/00, A61B90/00, A61B17/3205 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
A61B46/10 (EP,US);
A61B10/025 (EP,US);
A61B10/0283 (EP,US);
A61B17/162 (EP,US);
A61B17/1637 (EP,US);
A61B46/00 (EP,US);
A61B50/30 (EP,US);
A61B50/33 (EP,US);
A61B17/32002 (EP,US);
A61B17/32053 (EP,US);
A61B2010/0258 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00362 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00685 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00734 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320064 (EP,US);
A61B2050/3008 (EP,US);
A61B2090/062 (EP,US);
A61B46/23 (EP,US);
A61B90/40 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/23] | A61B10/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/10] |
Former [2020/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KNOCHENMARK-ABSAUGVORRICHTUNGEN | [2020/23] | English: | BONE MARROW ASPIRATION DEVICES | [2020/23] | French: | DISPOSITIFS D'ASPIRATION DE MOELLE OSSEUSE | [2020/23] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 29.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07842288.8 / EP2066389 | EP16196168.5 / EP3167813 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 12.11.2019 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | SE | 08.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | PT | 08.03.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5331972 (WADHWANI SURESH [US], et al) [Y] 6,7,9-12 * column 3, line 55 - line 67 * * column 4, line 32 - line 60; figures 1-12 *[A] 8; | [XI]US6015391 (RISHTON MICHAEL LYNE [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * column 3 - column 5; figures 1-3, 11 * [I] 2; | [X]US6110128 (ANDELIN JOHN B [US], et al) [X] 1,3,13,14 * column 4 - column 6; figures 4, 7, 8, 10 *; | [XAY]US2003225344 (MILLER LARRY J [US]) [X] 1,3,14 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-3 * [A] 8 [Y] 6,7,9-12 | by applicant | US4553539 | US20050042912 | US20070910122 |