EP3654239 - CONTACT AND NON-CONTACT IMAGE-BASED BIOMETRICS USING PHYSIOLOGICAL ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alitheon, Inc. 10900 NE 8th Street, Suite 613 Bellevue, WA 98004 / US | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Land, Scot E. 10900 NE 8th Street, Suite 613 Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US | 02 /
Ross, David Justin 10900 NE 8th Street, Suite 613 Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US | 03 /
Shannon, Will 10900 NE 8th Street, Suite 613 Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US | 04 /
Ross, Robert 10900 NE 8th Street, Suite 613 Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US | 05 /
Qian, Cheng 10900 NE 8th Street, Suite 613 Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Herre, Peter, et al Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Neuhauser Straße 47 80331 München / DE | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 19208711.2 | 12.11.2019 | [2020/21] | Priority number, date | US201862760318P | 13.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862760318 P | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3654239 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
G06V40/10 (EP,US);
G06F16/5866 (US);
G06V40/50 (US);
G06V40/70 (US);
H04L63/0861 (US);
G06F16/583 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] |
Former [2020/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGSBEHAFTETE UND BERÜHRUNGSLOSE BILDBASIERTE BIOMETRIE MIT PHYSIOLOGISCHEN ELEMENTEN | [2020/21] | English: | CONTACT AND NON-CONTACT IMAGE-BASED BIOMETRICS USING PHYSIOLOGICAL ELEMENTS | [2020/21] | French: | BIOMÉTRIE PAR CONTACT ET SANS CONTACT À BASE D'IMAGES UTILISANT DES ÉLÉMENTS PHYSIOLOGIQUES | [2020/21] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 20.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 25.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/17] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 25.02.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 25.02.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.03.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016057138 (HOYOS HECTOR [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,12,13,15 * figures 2A, 3-5 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0127] *[I] 4,6,9-11,14 |