EP3653585 - REVERSE OSMOSIS WATERMAKER WITH PRESSURE AMPLIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schenker Italia S.r.l. Via delle Repubbliche Marinare, 67 80147 Napoli / IT | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERDE, Riccardo Viale Raffaello, 14 I-80129 Italy / IT | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Cantaluppi, Stefano, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Via A. Canova, 2 20145 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/21] | Cantaluppi, Stefano, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18 35122 Padova / IT | Application number, filing date | 19208720.3 | 12.11.2019 | [2020/21] | Priority number, date | IT20180010303 | 13.11.2018 Original published format: IT201800010303 | [2020/21] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3653585 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/44, B01D61/06, // F04B9/115, F15B3/00 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
B01D61/06 (EP);
C02F1/441 (EP);
F04B9/115 (EP);
F15B3/00 (EP);
Y02A20/131 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] |
Former [2020/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UMKEHROSMOSE-WASSERMACHER MIT DRUCKVERSTÄRKER | [2020/21] | English: | REVERSE OSMOSIS WATERMAKER WITH PRESSURE AMPLIFIER | [2020/21] | French: | DESSALINISATEUR À OSMOSE INVERSE AVEC AMPLIFICATEUR DE PRESSION | [2020/21] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 19.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4734013 (VALAVAARA VILJO K [CA]) [A] 1-10 * figure 6 *; | [ID]FR2732727 (2M [FR]) [ID] 1-10 * page 16, line 14 - line 24; figures 1,2 * * page 28, line 27 - line 32 *; | [A]US6203696 (PEARSON COLIN [GB]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *; | [A]US8052865 (KLOOS STEVEN D [US], et al) [A] 1-10* column 11, line 6 - line 67; figures 7A-7C *; | [A]WO2013018036 (REX SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 3 * | by applicant | FR2732727 | US6491813 |