EP3654046 - NON-DESTRUCTIVE INSPECTION SYSTEM FOR DETECTING DEFECTS IN COMPOUND SEMICONDUCTOR WAFER AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Sangmin 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu 16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Jung, Jinwook 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu 16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 19208921.7 | 13.11.2019 | [2020/21] | Priority number, date | KR20180139126 | 13.11.2018 Original published format: KR 20180139126 | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3654046 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/28, H01L21/66 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
G01R31/2831 (EP);
G01N23/18 (US);
G01N21/9501 (US);
G01N23/083 (US);
H01L22/14 (EP);
H01L22/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ZERSTÖRUNGSFREIEN INSPEKTION ZUR DETEKTION VON DEFEKTEN IN EINEM VERBUNDHALBLEITERWAFER UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/21] | English: | NON-DESTRUCTIVE INSPECTION SYSTEM FOR DETECTING DEFECTS IN COMPOUND SEMICONDUCTOR WAFER AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE SAME | [2020/21] | French: | SYSTÈME D'INSPECTION NON DESTRUCTIVE POUR DÉTECTER DES DÉFAUTS DANS UNE TRANCHE DE SEMICONDUCTEUR DE COMPOSÉ ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2020/21] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 13.08.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPH11284039 (HORIBA LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]JP2000150603 (HORIBA LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]JP2000154094 (HORIBA LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2009002000 (NIKAWA KIYOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0057] *; | [A]US5216362 (VERKUIL ROGER L [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 31 - column 2, line 17 * * column 3, line 5 - column 6, line 50 * |