EP3822596 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SENSING TIP FOR A TEMPERATURE SENSING DEVICE, TEMPERATURE SENSING DEVICE, COMBUSTION ENGINE AND VEHICLE COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 13.11.2024 [2024/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hidria d.o.o. Spodnja Kanomlja 23 5281 Spodnja Idrija / SI | [2024/12] |
Former [2021/20] | For all designated states HIDRIA d.o.o. Nazorjeva ulica 6a 1000 Ljubljana / SI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENDA, Jani Poljubinj 6 5220 TOLMIN / SI | 02 /
MILOST, Uros Ulica Gradnikove brigade 17 5000 Nova Gorica / SI | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | BARRE LAFORGUE 35, rue Lancefoc 31000 Toulouse / FR | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 19208929.0 | 13.11.2019 | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3822596 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3822596 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01K1/08 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
G01K1/08 (EP);
G01K2205/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51]
![]() |
Former [2021/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MESSSPITZE FÜR EINE TEMPERATURMESSVORRICHTUNG, TEMPERATURMESSVORRICHTUNG, VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR UND FAHRZEUG DAMIT | [2023/27] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SENSING TIP FOR A TEMPERATURE SENSING DEVICE, TEMPERATURE SENSING DEVICE, COMBUSTION ENGINE AND VEHICLE COMPRISING THE SAME | [2021/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE POINTE DE DÉTECTION POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE LA TEMPÉRATURE, DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE LA TEMPÉRATURE, MOTEUR À COMBUSTION ET VÉHICULE LE COMPRENANT | [2021/20] |
Former [2021/20] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MESSERSPITZE FÜR EINE TEMPERATURMESSVORRICHTUNG, TEMPERATURMESSVORRICHTUNG, VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR UND FAHRZEUG DAMIT | Examination procedure | 15.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 15.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | MC | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | IE | 13.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | [2024/46] |
Former [2024/40] | CZ | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
MC | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SK | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SK | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 12.01.2024 | |
IS | 11.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4934831 (VOLBRECHT ARTHUR O [US]) [X] 1,3-6,9,12,13 * abstract * * column 1, lines 6-9, 48-58 * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 15 * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 4 * * figures 1-12 * * column 4, lines 24-27 * [I] 2,7,8,10,11,14,15; | [A]WO2009146447 (ROSEMOUNT INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 1, lines 6-9 ** page 2, lines 14-18, 33-34 * | by applicant | EP2199768 | US2017350765 |