EP3654009 - ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR DETECTING LEAKS IN A WATER GUIDANCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viega Technology GmbH & Co. KG Viega Platz 1 57439 Attendorn / DE | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Winterholler, Arthur Mühlenweg 33a 57439 Attendorn / DE | 02 /
Stähler, Ben Hans-Böckler-Straße 8 57223 Kreuztal / DE | 03 /
Rischen, Christian Obersalwey 19 59889 Eslohe / DE | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 19209066.0 | 14.11.2019 | [2020/21] | Priority number, date | DE201810128855 | 16.11.2018 Original published format: DE102018128855 | [2020/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3654009 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3654009 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/28, G01M3/40, E03B7/00, E03B7/07 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
G01M3/2815 (EP,US);
E03B7/003 (EP,US);
E03B7/071 (EP);
F04B51/00 (US);
F24H15/12 (EP);
G01M3/40 (EP);
Y02A20/15 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/21] | G01M3/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] |
Former [2020/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM DETEKTIEREN VON LECKAGEN IN EINEM WASSERLEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/21] | English: | ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR DETECTING LEAKS IN A WATER GUIDANCE SYSTEM | [2020/21] | French: | AGENCEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DES FUITES DANS UN SYSTÈME DE CONDUITES D'EAU | [2020/21] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 10.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.06.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 22.06.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.06.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE3316849 (KRUPP GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-5 * page 13, line 28 - page 17, line 6; figure 1 *; | [I]DE19529362 (INNOVATHERM PROF DR LEISENBERG GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [I] 1-5 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB2313197 (ADVANCED ENERGY MONITOR SYST [GB]) [X] 6-8 * page 6, line 10 - page 10, line 5; figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB2430496 (ADVANCED ENERGY MONITOR SYST [GB]) [X] 6-8 * page 4, line 13 - page 9, line 12; figure 1 *; | [XI]DE102009051931 (SMS SIEMAG AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0059]; figures 1,2 * [I] 2,5; | [A]US9823156 (JERPHAGNON OLIVIER [US], et al) [A] 6-8* the whole document * |