EP3821716 - UREA AMMONIUM SULPHATE-BASED COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yara International ASA Drammensveien 131 0277 Oslo / NO | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Colpaert, Filip Klossestraat 54 9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | 02 /
Donkers, Ellen Koninginnepage 21 4533 HS Terneuzen / NL | 03 /
Van Belzen, Ruud c/o Yara Sluiskil B.V. Industrieweg 10 4541 HJ Sluiskil / NL | 04 /
Van de Walle, Tom Opperstraat 24 9180 Moerbeke-Waas / BE | 05 /
Van Elslande, Paul c/o Yara Sluiskil B.V. Industrieweg 10 4541 HJ Sluiskil / NL | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 19209468.8 | 15.11.2019 | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3821716 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A23K20/24, A23K20/20, C05C3/00, C05C9/00, C05D3/00, C05D9/02, C05G3/90, C05G5/12 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
C05C3/005 (EP,US);
C05C9/005 (EP,US);
C05D3/00 (EP,US);
C05D9/02 (EP,US);
C05G3/90 (EP);
C05G5/12 (EP,US);
Y02P60/21 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C05C3/005, C05C9/005, C05D3/00, C05D9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUF HARNSTOFFAMMONIUMSULFATBASIS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2021/20] | English: | UREA AMMONIUM SULPHATE-BASED COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE THEREOF | [2021/20] | French: | COMPOSITION AMÉLIORÉE À BASE DE SULFATE D'AMMONIUM D'URÉE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2021/20] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/17] | 10.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN106069441 ; | [Y]CN104860775 ; | [XD]WO2017042194 (YARA INT ASA [NO]) [XD] 1-11,13-15 * page 7, line 17 - page 8, line 15 * * page 9, line 16 - line 32 * * page 10, line 30 - page 12, line 5 * * claim - *; | [X]WO2017081183 (YARA INT ASA [NO]) [X] 1-10,13-15 * page 10, line 8 - page 11, line 10 * * example 2 * * claim - *; | [A]WO2017168288 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* claim - *; | [XY]EP3567018 (YARA INT ASA [NO]) [X] 1-11,13-15 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0081] * * claim - * [Y] 12; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2017, no. 06, Database accession no. 2016-719005, XP002798981 & CN106069441 A 20161109 (WANGJIANG NONGWANG AGRIC SPECIALIZED COOP) [Y] 12 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2015, no. 80, Database accession no. 2015-62814W, XP002798982 & CN104860775 A 20150826 (GUANGDE LIMIN IRRIGATION & WATER CONSERV) [Y] 12 * abstract * | by applicant | US3785796 | US4530714 | WO9212633 | US5352265 | EP0768993 | WO9965845 | WO2006004424 | WO2006093413 | WO2017042194 |